SELENE FINANCE LP v. KEARNEY et al
Plaintiff: SELENE FINANCE LP
Defendant: DEBRA J KEARNEY and EDWARD KEARNEY
Interested Party: CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA NA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00405
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Set Deadlines : No answer or responsive pleading filed by CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA NA. Check for the Filing of a Motion for Entry of Default on 11/29/2019. (mnw)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service filed by SELENE FINANCE LP. CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA NA served on 9/16/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) Modified on 10/29/2019 to clean up text (mnw).
October 29, 2019 Set Deadlines : No answers or responsive pleadings filed by DEBRA J KEARNEY & EDWARD KEARNEY - Check for the Filing of a Motion for Entry of Default on 11/29/2019. (mnw)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SELENE FINANCE LP. EDWARD KEARNEY served on 9/12/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SELENE FINANCE LP. DEBRA J KEARNEY served on 9/12/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SELENE FINANCE LP. (DOONAN, JOHN)
September 6, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2074302.), filed by SELENE FINANCE LP.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
September 5, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/12/2019. (bfa)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA NA, DEBRA J KEARNEY, EDWARD KEARNEY. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Debra J. Kearney summons, #2 Citibank (South Dakota) N.A. summons)(bfa)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEBRA J KEARNEY, EDWARD KEARNEY PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by SELENE FINANCE LP. (Service of Process Deadline 12/4/2019) Fee due by 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B - Note, #3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D Assignment into BOA, #5 Exhibit E Assignment into Selene, #6 Exhibit F Quitclaim Assignment, #7 Exhibit G Demand Letter, #8 Exhibit H Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SELENE FINANCE LP v. KEARNEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBRA J KEARNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD KEARNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SELENE FINANCE LP
Represented By: JOHN A. DOONAN
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?