KLINGES v. POMERLEAU
Plaintiff: TERESA KLINGES
Defendant: KEVIN POMERLEAU
Case Number: 2:2019cv00418
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION - Per Order #16: Answer due by 11/27/2019. (mnw)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting without objection #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant KeyBank shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by November 27, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
November 4, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (WYCOFF, ERIC)
November 4, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION Responses due by 11/25/2019. (WYCOFF, ERIC)
November 4, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by KYLE M. NOONAN on behalf of KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (NOONAN, KYLE)
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC J. WYCOFF on behalf of KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (WYCOFF, ERIC)
October 17, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION - Per Summons Returned Executed #11: Answer due by 11/6/2019. (mnw)
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TERESA KLINGES. KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION served on 10/16/2019. (MARCUS, GEORGE)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against KEVIN POMERLEAU and KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, filed by TERESA KLINGES. (Service of Process Deadline 1/9/2020)(MARCUS, GEORGE) Modified on 10/11/2019 to add Kevin Pomerleau as named defendant in Amended Complaint (slg).
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Amend Complaint. REMINDER: After entry of this Order, counsel for the plaintiff shall separately file the AMENDED COMPLAINT document, ECF No. 7-1, as a separate filing on the court's docket forthwith. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend Complaint by TERESA KLINGES Responses due by 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MARCUS, GEORGE)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Entry of Default (no answer or responsive pleading having been filed) as to KEVIN POMERLEAU. Check for the Filing of a Motion for Default Judgment on 11/8/2019. By Melody Whitten, Deputy Clerk (mnw)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Entry of Default by TERESA KLINGES Responses due by 10/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Verified Statement of David C. Johnson, #2 proposed Entry of Default)(JOHNSON, DAVID)
September 20, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for KEVIN POMERLEAU - Per Summons Returned Executed #4: Answer due by 10/8/2019. (mnw)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TERESA KLINGES. KEVIN POMERLEAU served on 9/17/2019. (MARCUS, GEORGE)
September 11, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2077289.), filed by TERESA KLINGES.(MARCUS, GEORGE)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to KEVIN POMERLEAU. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KEVIN POMERLEAU with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by TERESA KLINGES. (Service of Process Deadline 12/10/2019) Fee due by 9/13/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KLINGES v. POMERLEAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN POMERLEAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERESA KLINGES
Represented By: GEORGE J. MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?