LANDRY v. VICTORIA'S SECRET STORES LLC et al
Plaintiff: KRISTY LANDRY
Defendant: VICTORIA'S SECRET STORES LLC and LIMITED BRANDS INC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00423
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III (tcs)Modified on 11/8/2019 to add Main Document to entry(tcs).
November 8, 2019 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Confidentiality Order AMENDED by LIMITED BRANDS INC, VICTORIA'S SECRET STORES LLC Responses due by 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order AMENDED)(FORD, BENJAMIN)
November 7, 2019 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Confidentiality Order by LIMITED BRANDS INC, VICTORIA'S SECRET STORES LLC Responses due by 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FORD, BENJAMIN)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting without objection #15 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The court's scheduling order, ECF No. 14, is amended to permit up to seven depositions per side and to extend the plaintiff's expert designation deadline to February 3, 2020 (February 1 being a Saturday), and the defendants' deadline to March 2, 2020 (March 1 being a Sunday). All other limitations and deadlines in the court's scheduling order shall otherwise remain in effect, including the discovery deadline of March 11, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
November 6, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by KRISTY LANDRY Responses due by 11/27/2019. (HANSEN, CHAD)
October 28, 2019 Set Deadlines : Attorney Adam J. Rocco shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 11/4/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (tcs)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/11/2020. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 3/18/2020. Motions due by 4/1/2020. Ready for Trial on 6/1/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (tcs)
October 23, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Adam J. Rocco filed by BENJAMIN E. FORD on behalf of LIMITED BRANDS INC, VICTORIA'S SECRET STORES LLC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2098085.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rocco Certification)(FORD, BENJAMIN)
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by LIMITED BRANDS INC, VICTORIA'S SECRET STORES LLC.(FORD, BENJAMIN)
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LIMITED BRANDS INC. (FORD, BENJAMIN)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by VICTORIA'S SECRET STORES LLC. (FORD, BENJAMIN)
October 8, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline Per Order at ECF #9 as to VICTORIA'S SECRET STORES LLC and LIMITED BRANDS INC : Answer due by 10/24/2019. (tcs)
October 8, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement as to LIMITED BRANDS INC and VICTORIA'S SECRET STORES LLC due by 10/15/2019. (tcs)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting without objection #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendants shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by October 24, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #7 MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer : Entry was modified to change selected CM/ECF event "MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order" to "MOTION to Extend Time to Answer" (tcs)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by LIMITED BRANDS INC, VICTORIA'S SECRET STORES LLC Responses due by 10/28/2019. (FORD, BENJAMIN) Modified on 10/8/2019 to change event from "MOTION to amend scheduling order" to "MOTION to extend time.."(tcs).
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN E. FORD on behalf of LIMITED BRANDS INC, VICTORIA'S SECRET STORES LLC (FORD, BENJAMIN)
October 4, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for LIMITED BRANDS INC : Answer due by 10/16/2019. (tcs)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KRISTY LANDRY. LIMITED BRANDS INC served on 9/25/2019. (HANSEN, CHAD)
September 23, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for VICTORIA SECRET STORES, LLC: Answer due by 10/10/2019. (tcs)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KRISTY LANDRY. VICTORIA'S SECRET STORES LLC served on 9/19/2019. (HANSEN, CHAD)
September 16, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2078483.), filed by KRISTY LANDRY.(HANSEN, CHAD)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to LIMITED BRANDS INC, VICTORIA'S SECRET STORES LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Victoria's Secret Stores, LLC summons)(bfa)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LIMITED BRANDS INC, VICTORIA'S SECRET STORES LLC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by KRISTY LANDRY. (Service of Process Deadline 12/12/2019) Fee due by 9/16/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LANDRY v. VICTORIA'S SECRET STORES LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTY LANDRY
Represented By: CHAD T. HANSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICTORIA'S SECRET STORES LLC
Represented By: BENJAMIN E. FORD
Represented By: ADAM J. ROCCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIMITED BRANDS INC
Represented By: BENJAMIN E. FORD
Represented By: ADAM J. ROCCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?