CAMPLIN/MARINO PROPERTIES INC v. GAP INC
Plaintiff: CAMPLIN/MARINO PROPERTIES INC
Defendant: GAP INC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00439
Filed: September 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by GAP INC. (REICHL, NOLAN)
November 7, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by CAMPLIN/MARINO PROPERTIES INC. Reply due by 11/21/2019. (HOWE, EMILY)
October 23, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CAMPLIN/MARINO PROPERTIES INC. (HOWE, EMILY)
October 23, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Responses due by 11/7/2019. (akr)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting without objection #11 Motion to Extend Time. The plaintiff shall file its opposition to the defendant's motion to dismiss, ECF No. 10, by November 7, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
October 23, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/30/2019 as to CAMPLIN/MARINO PROPERTIES INC. (akr)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss by CAMPLIN/MARINO PROPERTIES INC Responses due by 11/12/2019. (DILWORTH, GEORGE)
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by GAP INC Responses due by 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joyce Morallos, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Joyce Morallos)(REICHL, NOLAN)
October 2, 2019 Filing Fee Received from GAP INC: Receipt Number: 0100-2086788 Method of Payment: CC Purpose of Payment: Filing Fee Date Paid: 10/01/2019 (akr)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by GAP INC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Record, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit A to Complaint - Lease, #4 Exhibit B to Complaint - 3rd Amendment to Lease, #5 Exhibit C - 8/28/16 Letter, #6 Summons, #7 Motion for Enlargement to Answer, #8 Order re Motion for Enlargement)(REICHL, NOLAN)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - REVISED by GAP INC. (REICHL, NOLAN)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by GAP INC re #1 Notice of Removal. Main Document: order on motion. (bfa)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 10/4/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
September 27, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for GAP INC : Answer due by 10/3/2019. (bfa)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GAP INC. (bfa)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 Declaration of Lisa Mertens filed by GAP INC. (bfa)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 Declaration of Nolan L. Reichl filed by GAP INC. (bfa)
September 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
September 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number CV-19-342. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by GAP INC. (Service of Process Deadline 12/26/2019) Fee due by 9/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 lease, #3 third amendment to lease, #4 8/28/16 letter, #5 summons, #6 motion for extension to answer, #7 annual report)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAMPLIN/MARINO PROPERTIES INC v. GAP INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAMPLIN/MARINO PROPERTIES INC
Represented By: GEORGE T. DILWORTH
Represented By: EMILY T. HOWE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GAP INC
Represented By: NOLAN L. REICHL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?