DUNNIGAN v. YORK COUNTY et al
Plaintiff: BRIAN DUNNIGAN
Defendant: DONOVAN CRAM, YORK COUNTY, WILLIAM KING, ERIC DAIGNEAULT and MATTHEW ROCCHIO
Case Number: 2:2019cv00450
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for Sheriff William King and York County Defendants waived service on 10/22/19: Answer due by 12/23/2019. (mjlt)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed WILLIAM KING waiver sent on 10/22/2019; YORK COUNTY waiver sent on 10/22/2019. (DONAHUE, BENJAMIN)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by BRIAN DUNNIGAN re #1 Complaint,, . Main Document: Exhibit A - Taser Inventory. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - York County Policies)(DONAHUE, BENJAMIN)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to WILLIAM KING. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (slg)
October 4, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2089464.), filed by BRIAN DUNNIGAN.(DONAHUE, BENJAMIN)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to DONOVAN CRAM, ERIC DAIGNEAULT, MATTHEW ROCCHIO, YORK COUNTY. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Donovan Cram summons, #2 Eric Daigneault summons, #3 Matthew Rocchio summons)(bfa)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DONOVAN CRAM, ERIC DAIGNEAULT, WILLIAM KING, MATTHEW ROCCHIO, YORK COUNTY with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by BRIAN DUNNIGAN. (Service of Process Deadline 1/2/2020) Fee due by 10/7/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DUNNIGAN v. YORK COUNTY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONOVAN CRAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YORK COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM KING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC DAIGNEAULT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW ROCCHIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN DUNNIGAN
Represented By: BENJAMIN N. DONAHUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?