VIOLETTE v. PHILLIPS et al
Plaintiff: GREGORY PAUL VIOLETTE
Defendant: US PROBATION and KATE PHILLIPS
Case Number: 2:2019cv00458
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: ANDREA K JOHNSTONE
Referring Judge: JOSEPH N LAPLANTE
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Case Assigned to JUDGE JOSEPH N LAPLANTE and MAGISTRATE JUDGE ANDREA K. JOHNSTONE. (mjlt)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER By JUDGE LANDYA B. MCCAFFERTY. (mjlt)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONCURRING ORDER By JUDGE LANDYA B. MCCAFFERTY. (mjlt)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (mjlt)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL. By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (mjlt)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (bfa)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (bfa)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (bfa)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (bfa)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (bfa)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (bfa) .
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (bfa)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by GREGORY PAUL VIOLETTE (bfa)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance form filed by GREGORY PAUL VIOLETTE (bfa)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KATE PHILLIPS, US PROBATION with Jury Demand, filed by GREGORY PAUL VIOLETTE. (Service of Process Deadline 1/7/2020) (Attachments: #1 envelope, #2 cover letter)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VIOLETTE v. PHILLIPS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US PROBATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATE PHILLIPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY PAUL VIOLETTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?