NORRIS v. CAPE ELIZABETH SCHOOL DISTRICT et al
Plaintiff: SHAEL NORRIS
Defendant: NATHAN CARPENTER, CAPE ELIZABETH SCHOOL DISTRICT, DONNA WOLFROM and JEFFREY SHEDD
Case Number: 2:2019cv00466
Filed: October 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 23 USCA Case Number 19-2167 for #20 Notice of Appeal, filed by NATHAN CARPENTER, JEFFREY SHEDD, CAPE ELIZABETH SCHOOL DISTRICT, DONNA WOLFROM. (bfa)
November 13, 2019 Abbreviated Appeal Record Transmitted Electronically to U.S. Court of Appeals re #20 Notice of Appeal (bfa)
November 13, 2019 Filing 22 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE Re: #20 Notice of Appeal. Documents sent to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (bfa)
November 13, 2019 Filing 21 APPEAL COVER SHEET Re: #20 Notice of Appeal (bfa)
November 13, 2019 COPIES of Notice of Appeal Sent to Counsel Re: #20 Notice of Appeal, filed by NATHAN CARPENTER, JEFFREY SHEDD, CAPE ELIZABETH SCHOOL DISTRICT, DONNA WOLFROM. (bfa)
November 8, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #18 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by CAPE ELIZABETH SCHOOL DISTRICT, NATHAN CARPENTER, JEFFREY SHEDD, DONNA WOLFROM . ( Filing fee $ 505 receipt number 0100-2106935.) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from our web site at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms/ MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel should also register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf and review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at # http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf (HEWEY, MELISSA)
November 6, 2019 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Waivers of Service Executed for CAPE ELIZABETH SCHOOL DISTRICT, NATHAN CARPENTER, JEFFREY SHEDD, DONNA WOLFROM : Answer due by 12/16/2019. (jwr)
November 6, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed CAPE ELIZABETH SCHOOL DISTRICT waiver sent on 10/17/2019; NATHAN CARPENTER waiver sent on 10/17/2019; JEFFREY SHEDD waiver sent on 10/17/2019; DONNA WOLFROM waiver sent on 10/17/2019. (BOND, EMMA)
October 24, 2019 Answer Deadline : Defendants' Answer due by 11/7/2019. (mjlt)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION mooting #3 Motion for TRO; granting #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (CJD)
October 21, 2019 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER: Oral Argument Hearing held re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order & MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by SHAEL NORRIS. Court will take the matter under advisement. (Court Reporter: Tammy Martell) (mjlt)
October 21, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by BRUCE W. SMITH on behalf of All Defendants (SMITH, BRUCE)
October 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to File By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (mjlt)
October 19, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File by SHAEL NORRIS Responses due by 11/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Screen shot)(mjlt)
October 19, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by SHAEL NORRIS. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shael Norris, #2 Declaration of AM)(mjlt)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Seal Attachment #5 to Response in Opposition to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jwr)
October 18, 2019 Filing 11 REDACTED Document re #9 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, Exhibit 4 to Shedd Decl. by CAPE ELIZABETH SCHOOL DISTRICT, NATHAN CARPENTER, JEFFREY SHEDD, DONNA WOLFROM. (HEWEY, MELISSA)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 (Document sealed from public view) MOTION to Seal Attachment #5 to Response in Opposition to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by CAPE ELIZABETH SCHOOL DISTRICT, NATHAN CARPENTER, JEFFREY SHEDD, DONNA WOLFROM Responses due by 11/8/2019. (HEWEY, MELISSA)
October 17, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction per Order of Judge Walker: Reply due by 10/18/2019. (jwr)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CAPE ELIZABETH SCHOOL DISTRICT, NATHAN CARPENTER, JEFFREY SHEDD, DONNA WOLFROM. Reply due by 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Shedd, #2 Exhibit 1 to Shedd Decl. (Policies JICK and JICK-R), #3 Exhibit 2 to Shedd Decl. (Policy ACAA), #4 Exhibit 3 to Shedd Decl. (Confidential Report), #5 *sealed due to personal data identifiers*Exhibit 4 to Shedd Decl. (Oct. 3 email), #6 Exhibit 5 to Shedd Decl. (Screenshot), #7 Declaration of Nate Carpenter, #8 Declaration of Cathy Stankard, #9 Declaration of Donna Wolfrom, #10 Exhibit 1 to Wolfrom Decl.)(HEWEY, MELISSA) Modified on 10/17/2019 (jwr).
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JEANA M. MCCORMICK on behalf of All Defendants (MCCORMICK, JEANA)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to File Briefs in Excess of Page Limit By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jwr)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Briefs in Excess of Page Limit by CAPE ELIZABETH SCHOOL DISTRICT, NATHAN CARPENTER, JEFFREY SHEDD, DONNA WOLFROM Responses due by 11/7/2019. (HEWEY, MELISSA)
October 15, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2093025.), filed by SHAEL NORRIS.(BOND, EMMA)
October 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2019 10:00 AM in Portland Courtroom 1 before JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (mjlt)
October 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re: Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Defendant shall file a Response due by 10/17/2019. Plaintiff shall file a reply by 10/18/2019. Parties to notify the Court by 10/15/2018 as to whether or not the hearing set for October 21, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. will be testimonial. By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (mjlt)
October 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by SHAEL NORRIS (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Clara Porter)(jwr)
October 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jwr)
October 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CAPE ELIZABETH SCHOOL DISTRICT, NATHAN CARPENTER, JEFFREY SHEDD, DONNA WOLFROM PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by SHAEL NORRIS. (Service of Process Deadline 1/13/2020) Fee due by 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Att A Sept 20 Letter, #2 Att B October 4 Letter, #3 Att C Oct 9 Letter, #4 Att D Oct 11 Letter)(jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NORRIS v. CAPE ELIZABETH SCHOOL DISTRICT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAEL NORRIS
Represented By: ZACHARY L. HEIDEN
Represented By: EMMA EATON BOND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATHAN CARPENTER
Represented By: MELISSA A. HEWEY
Represented By: JEANA M. MCCORMICK
Represented By: BRUCE W. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPE ELIZABETH SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: MELISSA A. HEWEY
Represented By: JEANA M. MCCORMICK
Represented By: BRUCE W. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONNA WOLFROM
Represented By: MELISSA A. HEWEY
Represented By: JEANA M. MCCORMICK
Represented By: BRUCE W. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY SHEDD
Represented By: MELISSA A. HEWEY
Represented By: JEANA M. MCCORMICK
Represented By: BRUCE W. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?