MACLAUGHLIN v. TOWN OF CHESTER NEW HAMPSHIRE et al
Plaintiff: VICTORIA MACLAUGHLIN
Defendant: TOWN OF ELIOT MAINE, DANA LEE, JOHN DOE and TOWN OF CHESTER NEW HAMPSHIRE
Case Number: 2:2019cv00497
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for TOWN OF CHESTER NEW HAMPSHIRE : Answer due by 1/10/2020. (tcs)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting without objection #13 Motion to Set Aside Default ; granting #13 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint; granting #13 Motion for Scheduling Order. The Court sets aside the default entered against Defendant Town of Chester. The deadline for Defendant Town of Chester to file its response to complaint is extended to January 10, 2020. The Court will issue an amended scheduling order after Defendant Town of Chester files its response to the complaint. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
December 23, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Set Aside 10 Order on Motion for Entry of Default MOTION to Reset Answer Deadline and MOTION to Reissue Scheduling Order by TOWN OF CHESTER NEW HAMPSHIRE Responses due by 1/13/2020. (SCOTT, K.) Added MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer, MOTION on 12/23/2019 (tcs).
December 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by K. JOSHUA SCOTT on behalf of TOWN OF CHESTER NEW HAMPSHIRE (SCOTT, K.)
December 16, 2019 Set Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default Judgment as to TOWN OF CHESTER NEW HAMPSHIRE on 5/20/2020. (tcs)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/29/2020. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 5/6/2020. Motions due by 5/20/2020. Ready for Trial on 7/6/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Entry of Default (no answer or responsive pleading having been filed) as to TOWN OF CHESTER NEW HAMPSHIRE By DEPUTY CLERK: Teagan Snyder (tcs)
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Default by VICTORIA MACLAUGHLIN Responses due by 1/2/2020. (TOWNSEND, ALLAN)
December 10, 2019 Set Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to TOWN OF CHESTER NEW HAMPSHIRE on 1/9/2020. (tcs)
November 25, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for TOWN OF CHESTER NEW HAMPSHIRE : Answer due by 12/9/2019. (tcs)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VICTORIA MACLAUGHLIN as to TOWN OF CHESTER NEW HAMPSHIRE. (TOWNSEND, ALLAN) Modified on to include name of party served 11/25/2019 (tcs).
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VICTORIA MACLAUGHLIN. TOWN OF CHESTER NEW HAMPSHIRE served on 11/18/2019. (TOWNSEND, ALLAN)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by DANA LEE, TOWN OF ELIOT MAINE.(BROGAN, JONATHAN)
November 13, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for DANA LEE : Answer due by 11/26/2019. (tcs)
November 13, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for TOWN OF ELIOT MAINE : Answer due by 11/25/2019. (tcs)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VICTORIA MACLAUGHLIN. DANA LEE served on 11/5/2019. (TOWNSEND, ALLAN)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VICTORIA MACLAUGHLIN. TOWN OF ELIOT MAINE served on 11/4/2019. (TOWNSEND, ALLAN)
October 29, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2101137.), filed by VICTORIA MACLAUGHLIN.(TOWNSEND, ALLAN)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to TOWN OF CHESTER NEW HAMPSHIRE. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Town of Chester Selectmen, #2 Summons Issued as to Dana Lee, #3 Summons Issued as to Town of Eliot Maine)(mjlt)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (mjlt)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE, DANA LEE, TOWN OF CHESTER NEW HAMPSHIRE, TOWN OF ELIOT MAINE with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by VICTORIA MACLAUGHLIN. (Service of Process Deadline 1/27/2020) Fee due by 10/31/2019.(mjlt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MACLAUGHLIN v. TOWN OF CHESTER NEW HAMPSHIRE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF ELIOT MAINE
Represented By: DEVIN W. DEANE
Represented By: JONATHAN W. BROGAN
Represented By: TREVOR D. SAVAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANA LEE
Represented By: DEVIN W. DEANE
Represented By: JONATHAN W. BROGAN
Represented By: TREVOR D. SAVAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF CHESTER NEW HAMPSHIRE
Represented By: K. JOSHUA SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTORIA MACLAUGHLIN
Represented By: ALLAN K. TOWNSEND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?