PEPPIATT v. WESTCON MFG INC
Plaintiff: ROY PEPPIATT
Defendant: WESTCON MFG INC and WESTCON MFG INC doing business as THEAM USA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00531
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
2 Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal by ROY PEPPIATT. (QUINLAN, DANIELLE)
February 28, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WESTCON MFG INC. (THEBERGE, SHILOH)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/6/2020. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 7/13/2020. Motions due by 7/27/2020. Ready for Trial on 10/5/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by WESTCON MFG INC.(WAHRER, WILLIAM)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR recused. Case reassigned to JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN for all further proceedings By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (tcs)
January 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM J. WAHRER and SHILOH D THEBERGE on behalf of WESTCON MFG INC (WAHRER, WILLIAM) Modified on 1/28/2020 to include name of counsel (tcs).
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed WESTCON MFG INC waiver sent on 12/16/2019. (WHITE, LAURA)
December 18, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for WESTCON MFG INC : Answer due by 2/14/2020. (tcs)
November 20, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2112497.), filed by ROY PEPPIATT.(WHITE, LAURA)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to WESTCON MFG INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WESTCON MFG INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by ROY PEPPIATT. (Service of Process Deadline 2/18/2020) Fee due by 11/20/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PEPPIATT v. WESTCON MFG INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTCON MFG INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTCON MFG INC doing business as THEAM USA
Represented By: SHILOH D. THEBERGE
Represented By: WILLIAM J. WAHRER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROY PEPPIATT
Represented By: LAURA H. WHITE
Represented By: DANIELLE M. QUINLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?