FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. LEBEL et al
Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Defendant: MARK R LEBEL and DONNA M LEBEL
Interested Party: INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, CW BALDWIN & SON INC, MAINE REVENUE SERVICES, CACH LLC, PEOPLES UNITED BANK and K&R HOLDINGS INC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00574
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
December 23, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2131846.), filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CACH LLC, CW BALDWIN & SON INC, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, K&R HOLDINGS INC, DONNA M LEBEL, MARK R LEBEL, MAINE REVENUE SERVICES, PEOPLES UNITED BANK. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Donna M. Lebel summons, #2 Internal Revenue Service summons, #3 K&R Holdings, Inc summons, #4 Maine Revenue Services summons, #5 People`s United Bank summons, #6 CACH, LLC summons, #7 C.W. Baldwin & Son, Inc summons)(bfa)
December 20, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/27/2019. (bfa)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DONNA M LEBEL, MARK R LEBEL PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (Service of Process Deadline 3/19/2020) Fee due by 12/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Legal Description (Incomplete), #2 Exhibit B Legal Description (Complete), #3 Exhibit C Lost Note Affidavit, #4 Exhibit D Mortgage, #5 Exhibit E AOM to CWHL, #6 Exhibit F 2009 Loan Modification, #7 Exhibit G AOM to BAC, #8 Exhibit H 2015 Discharge of AOM to BAC, #9 Exhibit I 2012 Loan Modification, #10 Exhibit J AOM to FNMA, #11 Exhibit K QC AOM to FNMA, #12 Exhibit L Maine Bank & Trust Co. Mortgage & Subordination Agmt, #13 Exhibit M Demand Letter, #14 Exhibit N Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. LEBEL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: JOHN A. DOONAN
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CW BALDWIN & SON INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MAINE REVENUE SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CACH LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PEOPLES UNITED BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: K&R HOLDINGS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK R LEBEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONNA M LEBEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?