WADSWORTH v. MSAD 40/RSU 40 et al
Plaintiff: ADRIANNA WADSWORTH
Defendant: MEDOMAK VALLEY HIGH SCHOOL, CHUCK NGUYEN, MSAD 40/RSU 40 and ANDREW CAVANAUGH
Case Number: 2:2019cv00577
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by ANDREW CAVANAUGH.(LOUISON, DOUGLAS)
February 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by DOUGLAS I. LOUISON on behalf of ANDREW CAVANAUGH (LOUISON, DOUGLAS)
January 22, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for ANDREW CAVANAUGH : Answer due by 2/7/2020. (tcs)
January 22, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for MSAD 40/RSU 40, MEDOMAK VALLEY HIGH SCHOOL, and CHUCK NGUYEN : Answer due by 3/16/2020. (tcs)
January 21, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ADRIANNA WADSWORTH. ANDREW CAVANAUGH served on 1/17/2020. (DESCHUYTNER, RACHEL)
January 21, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed MEDOMAK VALLEY HIGH SCHOOL waiver sent on 1/15/2020. (DESCHUYTNER, RACHEL)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed MSAD 40/RSU 40 waiver sent on 1/15/2020. (DESCHUYTNER, RACHEL)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed CHUCK NGUYEN waiver sent on 1/14/2020. (DESCHUYTNER, RACHEL)
January 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN J. WALL, III on behalf of CHUCK NGUYEN (WALL, JOHN)
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eric R. LeBlanc filed by RACHEL J. DESCHUYTNER on behalf of ADRIANNA WADSWORTH (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2137424.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously submitted an e-filing request with the District of Maine, you will now need to register for PRO HAC VICE filing rights in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (DESCHUYTNER, RACHEL)
December 30, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2135564.), filed by ADRIANNA WADSWORTH.(LEBLANC, ERIC)
December 27, 2019 Set Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificate due by 1/3/2020. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (bfa)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ANDREW CAVANAUGH, MEDOMAK VALLEY HIGH SCHOOL, MSAD 40/RSU 40, CHUCK NGUYEN. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Andrew Cavanaugh summons, #2 MSAD 40 summons, #3 Medomak Valley High School summons, #4 Chuck Nguyen summons)(bfa)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW CAVANAUGH, MEDOMAK VALLEY HIGH SCHOOL, MSAD 40/RSU 40, CHUCK NGUYEN with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by ADRIANNA WADSWORTH. (Service of Process Deadline 3/26/2020) Fee due by 12/30/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WADSWORTH v. MSAD 40/RSU 40 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDOMAK VALLEY HIGH SCHOOL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHUCK NGUYEN
Represented By: JOHN J. WALL, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSAD 40/RSU 40
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW CAVANAUGH
Represented By: DOUGLAS I. LOUISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADRIANNA WADSWORTH
Represented By: ERIC R. LEBLANC
Represented By: RACHEL J. DESCHUYTNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?