MORANCY v. TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY MORANCY
Defendant: TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv00578
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CONSENT CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER granting #15 Motion for Confidentiality Order By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (clp)
February 14, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Confidentiality Order by TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY Responses due by 3/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(PARSONS, AIMEE)
February 14, 2020 Filing 14 **FILED IN ERROR** Unopposed MOTION for Confidentiality Order by TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY Responses due by 3/6/2020. (PARSONS, AIMEE) Modified on 2/14/2020 to mark as filed in error per indication of counsel (tcs).
February 6, 2020 Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines - Per Order #13: Discovery due by 7/17/2020. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 7/24/2020. Motions due by 8/7/2020. Ready for Trial on 9/8/2020. (clp)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. After a brief telephonic hearing with Attorneys Loranger and Parsons, for the plaintiff and defendant respectively, the court's scheduling order, ECF No. 7, is amended as follows: discovery shall be completed by July 17, 2020; any Local Rule 56(h) notice shall be filed by July 24, 2020; any dispositive/Daubert/Kumho motions shall be due by August 7, 2020; and the plaintiff's written demand and the defendant's written response shall be served by July 6 (July 3 being a holiday) and July 17, respectively. All other limitations and deadlines in the court's scheduling order shall remain in effect, including the trial-ready date of September 8, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
February 6, 2020 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III: Hearing held on 2/6/2020 re ECF No. 8; docket order to follow. (Court Reporter: FTR) (RICH III, JOHN)
January 30, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Aimee B. Parsons filed by BYRNE J. DECKER on behalf of TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously submitted an e-filing request with the District of Maine, you will now need to register for PRO HAC VICE filing rights in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (DECKER, BYRNE)
January 29, 2020 Set Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney AIMEE B. PARSONS must register for a PACER account and/or register for e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.gov by 2/4/2020. For more details on NextGen/Pacer go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (clp)
January 29, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Aimee B. Parsons filed by BYRNE J. DECKER on behalf of TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2157516.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously submitted an e-filing request with the District of Maine, you will now need to register for PRO HAC VICE filing rights in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (DECKER, BYRNE)
January 29, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #8 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order with Incorporated Rule 26(F) Order: Telephone Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 11:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. Counsel shall initiate the call and contact chambers at the number provided once both parties are on the line.(slg)
January 28, 2020 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order with Incorporated Rule 26(F) Order by TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY Responses due by 2/18/2020. (DECKER, BYRNE)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/27/2020. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 6/3/2020. Motions due by 6/17/2020. Ready for Trial on 9/8/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (tcs)
January 8, 2020 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Docket Record, #2 Ltr from G. Loranger encl. Complaint and Summary Sheet, #3 Complaint, #4 Summary Sheet, #5 Notice Regarding Electronic Filing, #6 Plf's First Document Requests, #7 Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, #8 Ltr from G. Loranger encl executed Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Ltr from B. Decker encl Notice of Filing, #11 Notice of Filing, #12 Notice of Removal, #13 Ex. A to Notice of Removal, #14 Ex. B to Notice of Removal, #15 Ex. C to Notice of Removal, #16 Ex. D to Notice of Removal)(DECKER, BYRNE)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY.(DECKER, BYRNE)
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 1/9/2020. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY. (DECKER, BYRNE)
December 30, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2135856.), filed by TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY.(DECKER, BYRNE)
December 30, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY : Answer due by 1/6/2020. (bfa)
December 30, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/6/2020. (bfa)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from York County Superior Court, case number CV-2019-00264. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY. (Service of Process Deadline 3/30/2020) Fee due by 1/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Summons, #3 Exhibit B1 Notice Regarding Electronic Service, #4 Exhibit B2 Summary Sheet, #5 Exhibit B3 Plaintiffs First Document Request, #6 Exhibit B4 Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories, #7 Exhibit C Declaration of Brandi Williams, #8 Exhibit D Notice of Filing)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MORANCY v. TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY MORANCY
Represented By: GUY D. LORANGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY
Represented By: BYRNE J. DECKER
Represented By: AIMEE B. PARSONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?