TOURANGEAU v. NAPPI DISTRIBUTORS
Plaintiff: MICHELE TOURANGEAU
Defendant: NAPPI DISTRIBUTORS
Case Number: 2:2020cv00012
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for NAPPI DISTRIBUTORS : Answer due by 3/13/2020. (tcs)
January 24, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to NAPPI DISTRIBUTORS waiver sent on 1/13/2020. (QUINLAN, DANIELLE) Modified on 1/24/2020 to correct 1/14/2020 to 1/13/2020 and correct party from MICHELLE TOURANGEAU to NAPPI DISTRIBUTORS (tcs).
January 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN J. WALL, III on behalf of NAPPI DISTRIBUTORS (WALL, JOHN)
January 13, 2020 Filing 4 Summons REISSUED as to NAPPI DISTRIBUTORS (to include Civil Action No. on document). Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (clp)
January 13, 2020 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2145155.), filed by MICHELE TOURANGEAU.(QUINLAN, DANIELLE)
January 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to NAPPI DISTRIBUTORS. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (clp)
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (clp)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NAPPI DISTRIBUTORS with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by MICHELE TOURANGEAU. (Service of Process Deadline 4/9/2020) Fee due by 1/15/2020.(clp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TOURANGEAU v. NAPPI DISTRIBUTORS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAPPI DISTRIBUTORS
Represented By: JOHN J. WALL, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELE TOURANGEAU
Represented By: LAURA H. WHITE
Represented By: DANIELLE M. QUINLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?