WILSON v. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Petitioner: LYNETT S WILSON
Respondent: DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Case Number: 2:2020cv00019
Filed: January 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why the case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. On February 25, 2020, I held a telephone conference of counsel. At the conference I set a deadline of March 10, 2020, for Plaintiff's attorney to file his pro hac vice certification and to file a brief on his position and authority for a path going forward. As of today, no filings have been made.Show Cause Response due by 3/30/2020. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mnd)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why the case should be dismissed for failure to prosecute. On February 25, 2020, I held a telephone conference of counsel. At the conference I set a deadline of March 10, 2020, for Plaintiff's attorney to file his pro hac vice certification and to file a brief on his position and authority for a path going forward. As of today, no filings have been made. Show Cause Response due by 3/26/2020. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (MMB)
February 25, 2020 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. Telephone Conference held. Set Deadlines: Pro Hac Vice Certification by Attorney Robert F. Stone due by 3/10/2020. Plaintiff's Brief on authority and path going forward due by 3/10/2020. Response Brief due by 3/24/2020. Reply Brief due by 3/31/2020. (Court Reporter: Tammy Martell) (mnd)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to participate in conference with the court via telephone on February 25, 2020. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (MMB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to participate in 2/25/2020 telephone conference pending Pro Hac Vice Application by LYNETT S WILSON Responses due by 3/16/2020. (STONE, ROBERT) Modified on 2/24/2020 to clean up text (mnd).
February 4, 2020 Reset Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificate as to Attorney ROBERT F. STONE due by 2/10/2020. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (clp)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (MMB)
February 3, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION by Attorney Margaret Jantzen to Withdraw as Attorney by DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS Responses due by 2/24/2020. (OSBORN, JOHN)
January 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN G. OSBORN on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (OSBORN, JOHN)
January 30, 2020 Reset Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process. Attorney MARGARET JANTZEN must register for a PACER account and/or register for e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.gov by 2/6/2020. For more details on NextGen/Pacer go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (mnd)
January 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephone Conference set for 2/25/2020 at 4:00 PM before JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. Counsel shall coordinate amongst themselves who can initiate the conference call. Once all participants are on the line, counsel shall call in to 207-221-0028 for the conference. (mnd)
January 27, 2020 Set Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificate due from Attorney ROBERT F. STONE by 2/3/2020. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (mnd)
January 22, 2020 Set Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney Margaret Jantzen must register for a PACER account and/or register for e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.gov by 1/29/2020. For more details on NextGen/Pacer go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (bfa)
January 17, 2020 Filing 1 Case transferred in from District of US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit; Case Number 19-2283. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received., filed by DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: #1 docket, #2 notice of docketing, #3 petition for review, #4 petitioner's docketing statement, #5 petitioner's certificate of interest, #6 petitioner's 15(c) statement, #7 Robert Stone's entry of appearance, #8 notice of non-compliance, #9 Margaret Jantzen's entry of appearance, #10 attestation of index of documents of administrative record, #11 index of documents of administrative record, #12 initial decisions dated 7/26/18 and 5/16/19, #13 petitioner's docketing statement, #14 petitioner's entry of appearance, #15 petitioner's certificate of interest, #16 petitioner's 15(c) statement, #17 respondent's docketing statement, #18 petitioner's motion to extend time to file brief, #19 petitioner's certificate of interest, #20 respondent's motion to dismiss or transfer, #21 petitioner's objection to motion to dismiss or transfer, #22 petitioner's certificate of service re: compliance of motion, #23 order on motion to extend time to file brief)(bfa) Modified on 1/22/2020 to correct filing date(bfa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILSON v. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LYNETT S WILSON
Represented By: ROBERT F. STONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Represented By: MARGARET JANTZEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?