LENNAN v. HEALTHCARE SERVICE GROUP INC
Plaintiff: LISA LENNAN
Defendant: HEALTHCARE SERVICE GROUP INC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00057
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Set Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorneys Kleinman and Batoff must register for a PACER account and/or register for e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.gov by 2/27/2020. For more details on NextGen/Pacer go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (lrc)
February 20, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alexander V. Batoff filed by JAMES R. ERWIN on behalf of HEALTHCARE SERVICE GROUP INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2174804.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (ERWIN, JAMES)
February 20, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kenneth D. Kleinman filed by JAMES R. ERWIN on behalf of HEALTHCARE SERVICE GROUP INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2174793.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (ERWIN, JAMES)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/8/2020. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 7/15/2020. Motions due by 7/29/2020. Ready for Trial on 10/5/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
February 18, 2020 Filing Fee Received from HEALTHCARE SERVICE GROUP INC: Amount Paid: $400. Receipt Number: AMEDC-2172942. Method of Payment: Credit Card. Purpose of Payment: Filing Fee. Date Paid: 2/18/2020 (lrc)
February 18, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HEALTHCARE SERVICE GROUP INC. (bfa)
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by HEALTHCARE SERVICE GROUP INC.(bfa)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD and Affidavit by HEALTHCARE SERVICE GROUP INC. (Attachments: #1 Certified Docket Record, #2 Complaint, #3 Summary Sheet)(bfa)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number CV-19-439. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by HEALTHCARE SERVICE GROUP INC. (Service of Process Deadline 5/18/2020) Fee due by 2/20/2020.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LENNAN v. HEALTHCARE SERVICE GROUP INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA LENNAN
Represented By: GUY D. LORANGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEALTHCARE SERVICE GROUP INC
Represented By: JAMES R. ERWIN
Represented By: KENNETH D. KLEINMAN
Represented By: ALEXANDER V. BATOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?