HOWARD v. IDEXX DISTRIBUTION INC et al
Plaintiff: EBONY HOWARD
Defendant: IDEXX LABORATORIES INC and IDEXX DISTRIBUTION INC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00079
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by IDEXX DISTRIBUTION INC, IDEXX LABORATORIES INC. (CATERINE, MELINDA)
April 8, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Donald W. Myers filed by MELINDA J. CATERINE on behalf of IDEXX DISTRIBUTION INC, IDEXX LABORATORIES INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2207339.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (CATERINE, MELINDA)
March 30, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joshua B. Waxman filed by MELINDA J. CATERINE on behalf of IDEXX DISTRIBUTION INC, IDEXX LABORATORIES INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2201953.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (CATERINE, MELINDA)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorneys. Attorneys Scott, Stevens and Magnus' representation of the defendants is hereby terminated; the defendants continue to be represented by Attorney Caterine. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
March 27, 2020 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/10/2020 as to IDEXX DISTRIBUTION INC and IDEXX LABORATORIES INC. (aks)
March 27, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for IDEXX DISTRIBUTION INC and IDEXX LABORATORIES INC : Answer due by 5/5/2020. (aks)
March 27, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed IDEXX LABORATORIES INC waiver sent on 3/6/2020. (CONLON, NICHOLAS)
March 27, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed IDEXX DISTRIBUTION INC waiver sent on 3/6/2020. (CONLON, NICHOLAS)
March 27, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION by Attorney K. Joshua Scott, Christopher Stevens, and Eric Magnus to Withdraw as Attorney by IDEXX DISTRIBUTION INC, IDEXX LABORATORIES INC Responses due by 4/17/2020. (SCOTT, K.)
March 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #10 Notice (Other)/Correspondence : This entry has been marked "Filed in Error" and terminated on the system. Please note, local rule 83.2(c) directs that No attorney may withdraw an appearance in any action except by leave of Court. (aks)
March 26, 2020 Filing 10 ***FILED IN ERROR*** NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: Withdrawal of Appearance of Counsel for Defendants K. Joshua Scott, Christopher Stevens and Eric Magnus by All Defendants (SCOTT, K.) Modified on 3/27/2020 (aks).
March 26, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard W. Black filed by MELINDA J. CATERINE on behalf of IDEXX DISTRIBUTION INC, IDEXX LABORATORIES INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2200496.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (CATERINE, MELINDA)
March 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by MELINDA J. CATERINE on behalf of IDEXX DISTRIBUTION INC, IDEXX LABORATORIES INC (CATERINE, MELINDA)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines per General Order 2020-2 issued by Chief Judge Jon D. Levy on 3/18/2020 : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney CHRISTOPHER J. STEVENS must register for a PACER account and/or register for e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.gov by 4/22/2020. For more details on NextGen/Pacer go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (aks)
March 16, 2020 Set Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorneys CHRISTOPHER J. STEVENS and ERIC R. MAGNUS must register for a PACER account and/or register for e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.gov by 3/23/2020. For more details on NextGen/Pacer go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (akr)
March 13, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher J. Stevens filed by K. JOSHUA SCOTT on behalf of All Defendants (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2191660.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (SCOTT, K.)
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eric R. Magnus filed by K. JOSHUA SCOTT on behalf of All Defendants (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2191648.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (SCOTT, K.)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by K. JOSHUA SCOTT on behalf of All Defendants (SCOTT, K.)
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: of Filing Consent to Join Form by EBONY HOWARD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent to Sue Form)(CONLON, NICHOLAS)
March 5, 2020 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2185405.), filed by EBONY HOWARD.(CONLON, NICHOLAS)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason T. Brown and Nicholas R. Conlon filed by THOMAS L. DOUGLAS on behalf of EBONY HOWARD (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number AMEDC-2185357.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (DOUGLAS, THOMAS)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (clp)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against IDEXX DISTRIBUTION INC, IDEXX LABORATORIES INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by EBONY HOWARD. (Service of Process Deadline 6/3/2020) Fee due by 3/9/2020.(clp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOWARD v. IDEXX DISTRIBUTION INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EBONY HOWARD
Represented By: THOMAS L. DOUGLAS
Represented By: NICHOLAS R. CONLON
Represented By: JASON T. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDEXX LABORATORIES INC
Represented By: DONALD W. MYERS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. STEVENS
Represented By: ERIC R. MAGNUS
Represented By: JOSHUA B. WAXMAN
Represented By: K. JOSHUA SCOTT
Represented By: MELINDA J. CATERINE
Represented By: RICHARD W. BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDEXX DISTRIBUTION INC
Represented By: DONALD W. MYERS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. STEVENS
Represented By: ERIC R. MAGNUS
Represented By: JOSHUA B. WAXMAN
Represented By: K. JOSHUA SCOTT
Represented By: MELINDA J. CATERINE
Represented By: RICHARD W. BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?