TRUMAN v. KELLEY, et al
Plaintiff: PETER P TRUMAN
Defendant: DANA KELLEY, LAUREN DALY, ANTHONY GERMAINE, DAVID HEMINGWAY, KATHRYN SLATTERY and MICHAEL DUDDY
Case Number: 2:2020cv00108
Filed: March 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by PETER P TRUMAN. LAUREN DALY served on 4/16/2020; MICHAEL DUDDY served on 4/16/2020; ANTHONY GERMAINE served on 4/16/2020; DAVID HEMINGWAY served on 4/16/2020; DANA KELLEY served on 4/16/2020; KATHRYN SLATTERY served on 4/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(bfa)
March 24, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk's Office providing Information for Pro Se Parties handout. (bfa)
March 23, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by PETER P TRUMAN (bfa)
March 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Request for Discovery (bfa)
March 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance form filed by PETER P TRUMAN (bfa)
March 23, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
March 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LAUREN DALY, MICHAEL DUDDY, ANTHONY GERMAINE, DAVID HEMINGWAY, DANA KELLEY, KATHRYN SLATTERY with Jury Demand, filed by PETER P TRUMAN. (Service of Process Deadline 6/22/2020) (Attachments: #1 certificate of service, #2 envelope)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRUMAN v. KELLEY, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANA KELLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAUREN DALY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY GERMAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID HEMINGWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHRYN SLATTERY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL DUDDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETER P TRUMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?