LUKASAK v. PREMIER SPORTS EVENTS LLC et al
Plaintiff: JEFF LUKASAK
Defendant: STEPHEN GRIFFIN, LEGACY GLOBAL SPORTS LP and PREMIER SPORTS EVENTS LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00124
Filed: April 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Set Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificates due from ALL COUNSEL by 5/18/2020. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. The ECF event Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice is found in the Notices category of the Civil Events in CM/ECF. (mnd)
April 3, 2020 Set Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, ALL COUNSEL must register for a PACER account and/or register for e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.gov. For more details on NextGen/Pacer go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. ALL COUNSEL must register for e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER by 5/18/2020. (mnd)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Answer Deadlines for PREMIER SPORTS EVENTS LLC, LEGACY GLOBAL SPORTS LP & STEPHEN GRIFFIN : Answers due by 5/18/2020. Deadline calculated as 14 straight days after the 4/2/2020 Opinion and Order in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P 12(a)(4), plus an additional 30 days pursuant to the District of Maine's General Order 2020-2 issued by Chief Judge Jon D. Levy on 3/18/2020. (mnd)
April 3, 2020 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Michigan Western; Case Number 1:19-cv-00450. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 OPINION AND ORDER granting #9 motion to dismiss and transferring to District of Maine; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 4/3/2020.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to response to motion #9 filed by Stephen Griffin, Legacy Global Sports LP, Premier Sports Events LLC (Wilson, Brandon) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 4/3/2020.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE re #10 , #9 Notice of Non-Payment Due under Bonus Incentive Agreement by plaintiff Jeff Lukasak (Wilkinson, Mark) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 4/3/2020.]
September 6, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Stephen J. Staple on behalf of plaintiff Jeff Lukasak (Staple, Stephen) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 4/3/2020.]
September 6, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of John David Gardiner on behalf of plaintiff Jeff Lukasak (Gardiner, John) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 4/3/2020.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #9 filed by Jeff Lukasak (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unredacted Charge of Discrimination) (Wilkinson, Mark) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 4/3/2020.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by defendants Stephen Griffin, Legacy Global Sports LP, Premier Sports Events LLC; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Wilson, Brandon) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 4/3/2020.]
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER; deadline for defendants to answer or otherwise respond to complaint extended to 8/13/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 4/3/2020.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Response to First Amended Complaint [ECF No. 5] by defendants Stephen Griffin, Legacy Global Sports LP, Premier Sports Events LLC (Wilson, Brandon) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 4/3/2020.]
July 29, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Brandon John Wilson on behalf of defendants Stephen Griffin, Legacy Global Sports LP, Premier Sports Events LLC (Wilson, Brandon) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 4/3/2020.]
July 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; All Defendants; defendants Premier Sports Events LLC and Legacy Global Sports LP served 7/9/2019 answer due 7/30/2019, defendant Griffin served 7/11/2019 answer due 8/1/2019 (Wilkinson, Mark) Modified text on 7/15/2019 (mg). [Transferred from Michigan Western on 4/3/2020.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Stephen Griffin, Legacy Global Sports LP, Premier Sports Events LLC (ns) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 4/3/2020.]
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #3 (Wilkinson, Mark) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 4/3/2020.]
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jeff Lukasak (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Employment Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2, Bonus Incentive Agreement) (Wilkinson, Mark) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 4/3/2020.]
June 12, 2019 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Steve Griffin, Premier Sports Events LLC ; none provided (ns) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 4/3/2020.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ns) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 4/3/2020.]
June 10, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Jeff Lukasak in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4457585 (Wilkinson, Mark) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 4/3/2020.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Jeff Lukasak (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Employment Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2, Bonus Incentive Agreement) (Wilkinson, Mark) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 4/3/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LUKASAK v. PREMIER SPORTS EVENTS LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN GRIFFIN
Represented By: BRANDON JOHN WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEGACY GLOBAL SPORTS LP
Represented By: BRANDON JOHN WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PREMIER SPORTS EVENTS LLC
Represented By: BRANDON JOHN WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFF LUKASAK
Represented By: MARK S. WILKINSON
Represented By: JOHN DAVID GARDINER
Represented By: STEPHEN J. STAPLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?