WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB v. WILLARD
Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB
Defendant: EDWARD GEORGE WILLARD, EDWARD G WILLARD and EDWARD GORGE WILLARDE
Case Number: 2:2020cv00129
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
April 7, 2020 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2206351.), filed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to EDWARD GEORGE WILLARD. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EDWARD GEORGE WILLARD PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB. (Service of Process Deadline 7/6/2020) Fee due by 5/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B - Note, #3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D - Assignment into FNMA, #5 Exhibit E - Assignment into Wilmington, #6 Exhibit F - Demand Letters, #7 Exhibit G - Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(bfa)
April 6, 2020 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/13/2020. (bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB v. WILLARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD GEORGE WILLARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD G WILLARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD GORGE WILLARDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB
Represented By: JOHN A. DOONAN
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?