US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. WELCH
Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST
Defendant: RICHARD A WELCH
Interested Party: 21ST MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2020cv00140
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Set Deadlines: 21ST MORTGAGE CORPORATION served on 5/22/2020. Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 7/16/2020. (meh)
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. 21ST MORTGAGE CORPORATION served on 5/22/2020. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 21ST MORTGAGE CORPORATION, RICHARD A WELCH. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 21st Mortgage Corporation summons)(bfa)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RICHARD A WELCH PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. (Service of Process Deadline 7/21/2020) Fee due by 4/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B - Endorsed Note, #3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D Assignment into Nationstar, #5 Exhibit E Quitclaim Assignment into Nationstar, #6 Exhibit F Quitclaim Assignment into Nationstar, #7 Exhibit G Assignment into Specialized, #8 Exhibit H Demand Letter, #9 Exhibit I Demand Letters, #10 Exhibit J Affidavit Relating to Military Status)(bfa)
April 22, 2020 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/29/2020. (bfa)
April 22, 2020 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2214863.), filed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. WELCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST
Represented By: JOHN A. DOONAN
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: 21ST MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD A WELCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?