GAUTHIER v. US BANK TRUST NA et al
Plaintiff: MARGARET LUCY GAUTHIER
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10, NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC, US BANK TRUST NA and CALIBER HOME LOANS
Case Number: 2:2020cv00283
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas J. O'Neill, Esq. filed by JOHN A. DOONAN on behalf of CALIBER HOME LOANS, US BANK TRUST NA (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2322240.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (DOONAN, JOHN)
September 22, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Melissa Bruynell Manesse, Esq. filed by JOHN A. DOONAN on behalf of CALIBER HOME LOANS, US BANK TRUST NA (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number AMEDC-2322215.) The District of Maine is a CM/ECF NextGen Court. If PHV counsel has not previously been granted electronic filing rights with the District of Maine, PHV counsel will now need to submit a PRO HAC VICE request in this District via PACER at www.pacer.gov (DOONAN, JOHN)
September 22, 2020 Set Deadlines : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney Melissa Bruynell Manesse and Attorney Thomas J. O'Neill must register for a PACER account and/or register for e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.gov by 9/29/2020. For more details on NextGen/Pacer go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (meh)
September 11, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by CALIBER HOME LOANS, US BANK TRUST NA Responses due by 10/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)(DOONAN, JOHN)
September 9, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC Responses due by 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memo Of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(VOLPE, RICHARD)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to September 11, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
August 31, 2020 Reset Answer Deadline for NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC per ECF Order #17: Answer due by 9/11/2020. (meh)
August 30, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer Complaint by NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC Responses due by 9/21/2020. (VOLPE, RICHARD) Modified on 8/31/2020 to clean up docket text (meh).
August 30, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC. (VOLPE, RICHARD)
August 28, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by CALIBER HOME LOANS, US BANK TRUST NA.(DOONAN, JOHN) Modified on 8/31/2020 to clean up docket text (meh).
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to August 31, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
August 14, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC Responses due by 9/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(VOLPE, RICHARD)
August 14, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC per ECF Order #13: Answer due by 8/31/2020. (meh)
August 14, 2020 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/4/2020. (meh)
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by CALIBER HOME LOANS, US BANK TRUST NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified State Court Docket Record, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit 1 to State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2 to State Court Complaint, #5 Exhibit 3 to State Court Complaint, #6 Exhibit NOA and Motion for Enlargement for Nationstar, #7 Exhibit NOA for Caliber and US Bank, #8 Exhibit State Court Summary Sheet, #9 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal by Caliber and US Bank, #10 Exhibit Proofs of Service of State Court Complaint)(DOONAN, JOHN) Modified on 8/14/2020 to clean up docket text (meh).
August 12, 2020 Filing 10 ***FILED IN ERROR***STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by CALIBER HOME LOANS, US BANK TRUST NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court docket ALFSC2020-00035)(DOONAN, JOHN) Modified on 8/13/2020 to indicate filed in error and refiled at ECF 11 (meh).
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 Corrected CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CALIBER HOME LOANS, US BANK TRUST NA re #5 MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal(DOONAN, JOHN) Modified on 8/10/2020 to indicate the filing was a corrected version (meh).
August 7, 2020 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2290247.), filed by CALIBER HOME LOANS, US BANK TRUST NA.(DOONAN, JOHN)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to August 31, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER to Margaret Lucy Gauthier from the Clerk's Office providing information for Pro Se Parties handout. (mnd)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 8/13/2020. By Melody Dalphonse, Deputy Clerk (mnd)
August 6, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for per ECF Order #8: Answer due from CALIBER HOME LOANS & US BANK TRUST NA by 8/31/2020. (meh)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by CALIBER HOME LOANS & US BANK TRUST NA (mnd)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CALIBER HOME LOANS. (mnd)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by US BANK TRUST NA. (mnd)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (mnd)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by US BANK TRUST NA & CALIBER HOME LOANS from York County Superior Court, Case Number ALFSC-RE-2020-00035. Service of Process Deadline 11/3/2020. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. Fee due by 8/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Recorded Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Quitclaim Assignment, #4 Exhibit D - Assignment of Mortgage, #5 Exhibit E - Online Tax Assessment)(mnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GAUTHIER v. US BANK TRUST NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC
Represented By: RICHARD J. VOLPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US BANK TRUST NA
Represented By: JOHN A. DOONAN
Represented By: MELISSA BRUYNELL MANESSE
Represented By: THOMAS J. O'NEILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALIBER HOME LOANS
Represented By: JOHN A. DOONAN
Represented By: MELISSA BRUYNELL MANESSE
Represented By: THOMAS J. O'NEILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGARET LUCY GAUTHIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?