VITAMINSEA LLC v. BEAUTYMARK.INTERNATIONAL LLC
Plaintiff: VITAMINSEA LLC
Defendant: BEAUTYMARK.INTERNATIONAL LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00284
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by VITAMINSEA LLC. (JOYCE, JEFFREY)
August 7, 2020 Filing Fee Received : Amount Paid: $400. Receipt Number: AMEDC-2290041. Method of Payment: CC. Purpose of Payment: Filing Fee. Date Paid: 8/7/2020 (aks)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 AO FORM 120: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (clp)
August 6, 2020 Set Deadlines as to VITAMINSEA, LLC: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/14/2020. (clp)
August 6, 2020 Set Deadlines: Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney JEFFREY C. JOYCE must register for a PACER account and/or register for e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.gov by 8/14/2020. For more details on NextGen/Pacer go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (clp)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BEAUTYMARK.INTERNATIONAL LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (clp)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (clp)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BEAUTYMARK.INTERNATIONAL LLC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by VITAMINSEA LLC. (Service of Process Deadline 11/4/2020) Fee due by 8/10/2020.(clp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2020: #1 Exhibit 1-Registration Certificate for Plaintiff's Mark and Maintenance Records) (clp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VITAMINSEA LLC v. BEAUTYMARK.INTERNATIONAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VITAMINSEA LLC
Represented By: JEFFREY C. JOYCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEAUTYMARK.INTERNATIONAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?