HAMILTON v. STATE FARM AND CASUALTY COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: DOMINIQUE HAMILTON
Defendant: MARISA BROWN and STATE FARM AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv00285
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance form filed by DOMINIQUE HAMILTON (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(aks)
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re #1 Complaint, filed by DOMINIQUE HAMILTON. Objections to R&R due by 8/26/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
August 10, 2020 Set Deadlines : Pro Se Appearance Form due on 8/24/2020. (aks)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE re #1 Attachments to Complaint, filed by DOMINIQUE HAMILTON. Although the Clerks Office has no obligation to review pleadings for personal identifiers, please note that the above-referenced document contains personal identifiers in violation of Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1. Please also refer to the Information Handout for Pro Se Filers. This will be the only Notice of Violation of Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1 you will receive in this case. The filing party may remedy this violation by filing a redacted version of the document adding REDACTED to the top of the filing along with, a Motion to Seal the previously filed unredacted document. If no action is taken, the unredacted document will remain publicly available. (bfa)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DOMINIQUE HAMILTON (Attachments: #1 proposed order)(bfa)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MARISA BROWN, STATE FARM AND CASUALTY COMPANY, filed by DOMINIQUE HAMILTON. (Service of Process Deadline 11/4/2020) (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 statement of lost future earnings, #3 wage statement, #4 chiropractic initial exam, #5 chiropractic neurology re-exam, #6 patient financial policy, #7 Intermed billing statement, #8 Portland Chiropractic appointments, #9 Intermed billing statement, #10 letter for work absence, #11 insurance vehicle cash value assessment, #12 Maine crash report, #13 surgi care stock and bill product order form, #14 health care release form, #15 Wildwood Medicine patient indentifying details, #16 Portland Chiropractic appointments, #17 Portland Chiropractic Neurology appointments, #18 Intermed appointment card, #19 Geico subrogation agreement, #20 United Healthcare account summary, #21 MaineHealth billing statement, #22 Wildwood Medicine invoice, #23 Geico explanation of review, #24 United Healthcare claim detail, #25 Geico detailed payment summary, #26 United Healthcare EOB statement, #27 Geico detailed payment summary, #28 copy of complaint)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAMILTON v. STATE FARM AND CASUALTY COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARISA BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOMINIQUE HAMILTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?