NOBREGA v. YORK COUNTY SHERIFF et al
Plaintiff: DOMINGUS NOBREGA
Defendant: JAIL ADMINISTRATORS, MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, YORK COUNTY SHERIFF and CHAPLAIN
Case Number: 2:2020cv00302
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CHAPLAIN, YORK COUNTY SHERIFF. Reply due by 10/23/2020. (WALL, JOHN)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 **FILED IN ERROR** DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DOMINGUS NOBREGA (NO PDF ATTACHED, See ECF NO. 7). (tcs) Modified on 9/18/2020 to indicate entry was filed in error (tcs).
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by DOMINGUS NOBREGA Responses due by 10/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tcs)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #5 OBJECTION filed by CHAPLAIN, YORK COUNTY SHERIFF. (WALL, JOHN)
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 OBJECTION to Notice of Removal filed by DOMINGUS NOBREGA. Responses due by 9/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Wall, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Removal, #4 UCC Acknowledgment, #5 Notice by Affidavit re Copyright Infringment, #6 UCC Filing Statement, #7 Bond, #8 Bond Discharge, #9 Envelope)(aks)
August 20, 2020 Filing Fee Received : Amount Paid: $400. Receipt Number: AMEDC-2299188. Method of Payment: CC. Purpose of Payment: Filing Fee. Date Paid: 8/20/2020 (aks)
August 19, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for York County Sheriff, Chaplain : Answer due by 9/9/2020. (bfa)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS filed in State Court on August 10, 2020 Responses due by 9/9/2020. (bfa) Modified on 8/19/2020 to add state court info (bfa).
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD and Affidavit by CHAPLAIN, YORK COUNTY SHERIFF. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - docket sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Application to Proceed without Payment, #4 Exhibit 4 - Rule 17A Motion to Subpoena for Production of Documentary, #5 Exhibit 5 - Addendum to Complaint & Affidavit Witness List, #6 Exhibit 6 - Summons to William King, #7 Exhibit 7 - Summons to Chaplain Boyd, #8 Exhibit 9 - answer of Chaplain, York County Sheriff, #9 Exhibit 10 - Affidavit for Response to Respondents Response on Constitutional Violation(s) & Antisemitism Statements)(bfa) Modified on 8/19/2020 to correct description of #8(bfa).
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from York County Superior Court, case number CV-20-129. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by YORK COUNTY SHERIFF, CHAPLAIN. (Service of Process Deadline 11/17/2020) Fee due by 8/21/2020.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NOBREGA v. YORK COUNTY SHERIFF et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAIL ADMINISTRATORS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: JILLIAN R. O'BRIEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YORK COUNTY SHERIFF
Represented By: JOHN J. WALL, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAPLAIN
Represented By: JOHN J. WALL, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOMINGUS NOBREGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?