GRAHAM v. STATE OF MAINE
Petitioner: MARK GRAHAM
Respondent: STATE OF MAINE
Not Classified By Court: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - HABEAS CASES
Case Number: 2:2020cv00315
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Reset Deadlines as directed by Judge Nivison as to #9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by MARK GRAHAM : Objections to R&R due by 11/9/2020 (aks)
October 26, 2020 Filing 11 MAIL (Report and Recommended Decision) sent to Mark Graham returned as undeliverable. Reason: Not deliverable as addressed. Resent to Mark Graham at Mark Graham, Riverview Psychiatric Hospital, 250 Arsenal Street, 11 State House Station, Augusta, ME 04333. (aks)
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION filed by MARK GRAHAM re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - state court order, #2 Exhibit B - due process of law, #3 Exhibit C - additional facts, #4 petition mandate, #5 ifp, #6 proof of service, #7 cover sheet, #8 envelope)(bfa)
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by MARK GRAHAM. Objections to R&R due by 10/19/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION filed by MARK GRAHAM re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus.. (Attachments: #1 Maine District Court order, #2 due process of law, #3 additional facts, #4 filing fee waiver, #5 envelope)(bfa) Modified on 10/5/2020 to correct filing date (jwr).
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER mooting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court granted Petitioner's prior motion. (Order, ECF No. 4.) By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MARK GRAHAM (bfa)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION filed by MARK GRAHAM re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(bfa) .
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MARK GRAHAM (bfa)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION filed by MARK GRAHAM re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(bfa) . Modified on 9/29/2020 to correct name of document (jwr).
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by MARK GRAHAM. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRAHAM v. STATE OF MAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: STATE OF MAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MARK GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - HABEAS CASES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?