ORMSBY v. STATE OF MAINE
Petitioner: THAYNE ORMSBY
Respondent: STATE OF MAINE
Not Classified By Court: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - HABEAS CASES
Case Number: 2:2020cv00319
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Per Order #5: Reply deadline reset to 11/2/2020. (mnd)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Extend Time to File Reply in Support of Section 2254 Petition. Time is extended to November 2, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss by THAYNE ORMSBY Responses due by 11/6/2020. (TZOVARRAS, HUNTER)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER/RESPONSE/REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by STATE OF MAINE. Reply due by 10/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record (docket sheets))(MACOMBER, DONALD)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO ANSWER #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Responses due by 11/9/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by THAYNE ORMSBY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order denying Certificate of Probable Cause, #2 Exhibit B - Post Conviction Review Decision, #3 Exhibit C - Supreme Judicial Court of Maine affirming judgment and sentences)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ORMSBY v. STATE OF MAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: STATE OF MAINE
Represented By: DONALD W. MACOMBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: THAYNE ORMSBY
Represented By: HUNTER J. TZOVARRAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - HABEAS CASES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?