SHERWOOD v. GARLAND MANUFACTURING CO
Plaintiff: PAULA SHERWOOD
Defendant: GARLAND MANUFACTURING CO
Case Number: 2:2020cv00336
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GARLAND MANUFACTURING CO. (FRAME, GREGG)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/2/2021. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 4/9/2021. Motions due by 4/23/2021. Ready for Trial on 7/12/2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (clp)
November 13, 2020 Filing 4 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by GARLAND MANUFACTURING CO.(FRAME, GREGG)
November 13, 2020 Set Deadlines GARLAND MANUFACTURING CO: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/20/2020. (clp)
September 24, 2020 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2325001.), filed by PAULA SHERWOOD.(CLIFFORD, JAMES)
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to GARLAND MANUFACTURING CO. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
September 22, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
September 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GARLAND MANUFACTURING CO with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by PAULA SHERWOOD. (Service of Process Deadline 12/21/2020) Fee due by 9/24/2020.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHERWOOD v. GARLAND MANUFACTURING CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARLAND MANUFACTURING CO
Represented By: GREGG R. FRAME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAULA SHERWOOD
Represented By: ANDREW P. COTTER
Represented By: JAMES A. CLIFFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?