DIXON-TRIBOU v. WILKIE
Plaintiff: BONNIE DIXON-TRIBOU
Defendant: ROBERT WILKIE
Case Number: 2:2020cv00379
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 05:7703
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:19-cv-12303. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 14, 2020 Filing 17 Case transferred to the District of Maine (Portland). Case File Electronically Transferred to the Clerk in that District on October 14, 2020. (Paine, Matthew) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/15/2020.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 16 Judge William G. Young: ORDER of Transfer entered. (Gaudet, Jennifer) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/15/2020.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 15 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Motion Hearing held by video on 10/14/2020 re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Robert Wilkie. The Court enters an order denying #6 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. In light of special venue statute this case is ordered transferred to the United States District Court of Maine sitting in Portland, ME. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: Attorney Stone for the plaintiff and Ausa Johnson for the defendant) (Gaudet, Jennifer) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/15/2020.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 14 Assented to REPLY to Response to #11 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Due to Lack of Venue filed by Robert Wilkie. (Johnson, Anita) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/15/2020.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 13 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Paine, Matthew) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/15/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to #11 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Due to Lack of Venue filed by Robert Wilkie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Johnson, Anita) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/15/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Due to Lack of Venue by Robert Wilkie.(Johnson, Anita) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/15/2020.]
October 9, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing reset for 10/14/2020 at 11:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.(Gaudet, Jennifer) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/15/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2020 02:00 PM by video before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Gaudet, Jennifer) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/15/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bonnie Dixon-Tribou. (Stone, Robert) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/15/2020.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Robert Wilkie. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Johnson, Anita) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/15/2020.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Robert Wilkie.(Johnson, Anita) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/15/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita Johnson on behalf of Robert Wilkie (Johnson, Anita) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/15/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet Category by Bonnie Dixon-Tribou. (Stone, Robert) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/15/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Robert Wilkie. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/15/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/15/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Bonnie Dixon-Tribou v. Robert Wilkie Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7963546 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Bonnie Dixon-Tribou.(Stone, Robert) Modified on 11/8/2019 (Halley, Taylor). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/8/2019) (Paine, Matthew). Modified on 11/8/2019 (Paine, Matthew). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/15/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DIXON-TRIBOU v. WILKIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT WILKIE
Represented By: ANITA JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BONNIE DIXON-TRIBOU
Represented By: ROBERT F. STONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?