BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST v. BRITTANY ANN F/V et al
Plaintiff: BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST
Defendant: BRITTANY ANN F/V and RANDALL S MALONEY, JR
Interested Party: MACHIAS SAVINGS BANK
Case Number: 2:2020cv00460
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 31325
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST (ECONOMY, ALLISON)
December 15, 2020 Set Answer Deadline for MACHIAS SAVINGS BANK: Answer due by 2/12/2021. (mlm)
December 15, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST waiver received by MACHIAS SAVINGS BANK on 12/14/2020. (ECONOMY, ALLISON) Modified on 12/16/2020 to indicate as shown on attached document that the waiver was received on 12/14, not sent on 12/15 and it was Machias Savings Bank that was served (mlm).
December 15, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST. (ECONOMY, ALLISON)
December 14, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE FOR FORECLOSURE issued. (jwr)
December 14, 2020 Filing 6 WARRANT For Arrest In Rem Issued By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mlm)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF MARITIME ARREST granting #4 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mlm)
December 14, 2020 Filing Fee Received from BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST: Amount Paid: $402.00. Receipt Number: 121000059. Method of Payment: Check. Purpose of Payment: Filing Fee. Date Paid: 12/11/2020 (mtm)
December 10, 2020 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/17/2020. (bfa)
December 9, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST (bfa)
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MACHIAS SAVINGS BANK, RANDALL S MALONEY, JR. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Machias Savings Bank summons)(bfa)
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRITTANY ANN F/V, RANDALL S MALONEY, JR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST. (Service of Process Deadline 3/9/2021) Fee due by 12/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - vessel note, #2 Exhibit B - Vessel Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Abstract of Title, #4 Exhibit D - Commercial Security Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - Security Agreement File No. 20160204109000078-90, #6 Exhibit F - Mortgage Note, #7 Exhibit G - Mortgage Deed, #8 Exhibit H - HELOC Agreement, #9 Exhibit I - Open- End Mortgage and Security Agreement, #10 Exhibit J - UCC Financing Statement, File #20160317109000133-67, #11 Exhibit K - notification letter, #12 Exhibit L - notice of right to cure letter, #13 Exhibit M - notice of right to cure letter)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST v. BRITTANY ANN F/V et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRITTANY ANN F/V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDALL S MALONEY, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MACHIAS SAVINGS BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST
Represented By: ALLISON A. ECONOMY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?