LIBERTY v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Plaintiff: ERIC JAMES LIBERTY
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2021cv00016
Filed: January 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset Answer Deadline per Order at ECF No. 9 for SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER: Answer due by 4/29/2021. (tcs)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting without objection #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendant's deadlines to file his answer and the administrative record are extended to April 29, 2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER Responses due by 3/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jebby Rasputnis)(NAGELBERG, JAMES)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by ERIC JAMES LIBERTY. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER served on 1/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Receipts, #2 Proof of Delivery)(FENNER, RILEY)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Answer Deadline for SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER per Affidavit of Service, the United States Attorney for the District of Maine was served on 1/14/2021: Answer due by 3/15/2021. (lrt)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES J. NAGELBERG on behalf of SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER (NAGELBERG, JAMES)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Attorney General., #2 Summons issued as to United States Attorney's Office.)(mmm)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ERIC JAMES LIBERTY (mmm)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (mmm)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER, filed by ERIC JAMES LIBERTY. (Service of Process Deadline 4/12/2021)(mmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LIBERTY v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC JAMES LIBERTY
Represented By: RILEY L. FENNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Represented By: JAMES J. NAGELBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?