FALLER v. TWO BRIDGES REGIONAL JAIL
Plaintiff: CANDACE FALLER
Defendant: TWO BRIDGES REGIONAL JAIL
Case Number: 2:2021cv00063
Filed: February 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/3/2021. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 9/10/2021. Motions due by 9/24/2021. Ready for Trial on 12/6/2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
April 16, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by TWO BRIDGES REGIONAL JAIL.(MARCHESI, PETER)
March 12, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed TWO BRIDGES REGIONAL JAIL waiver sent on 3/9/2021. (RIOTTE, SAMUEL) Modified on 3/12/2021 to reflect a correct date the waiver was sent (lrt).
March 12, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for TWO BRIDGES REGIONAL JAIL per Waiver of Service Returned Executed: Answer due by 5/10/2021. (lrt)
February 25, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to TWO BRIDGES REGIONAL JAIL. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
February 25, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
February 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TWO BRIDGES REGIONAL JAIL with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by CANDACE FALLER. (Service of Process Deadline 5/26/2021) Fee due by 3/1/2021.(bfa)
February 25, 2021 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2451412.), filed by CANDACE FALLER.(RIOTTE, SAMUEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FALLER v. TWO BRIDGES REGIONAL JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CANDACE FALLER
Represented By: SAMUEL S. RIOTTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TWO BRIDGES REGIONAL JAIL
Represented By: PETER T. MARCHESI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?