ROSNER v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Plaintiff: KATHY ROSNER
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2021cv00095
Filed: April 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER: Answer due by 6/11/2021. (mlm)
April 30, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by KATHY ROSNER. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER served on 4/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Receipts, #2 Proof of Delivery)(FENNER, RILEY)
April 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by NATASHA OELTJEN on behalf of SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER (OELTJEN, NATASHA)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
April 5, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorney, #2 Summons Attorney General)(clp)
April 5, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by KATHY ROSNER (clp)
April 5, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (clp)
April 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER filed by KATHY ROSNER. (Service of Process Deadline 7/6/2021)(clp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROSNER v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Represented By: NATASHA OELTJEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHY ROSNER
Represented By: RILEY L. FENNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?