WILLIAMS v. FREY et al
Plaintiff: ABIJAH WILLIAMS
Defendant: MATTHEW WILLIAMS, AARON M FREY and JOHN D PELLETIER
Case Number: 2:2021cv00111
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re #1 Complaint filed by ABIJAH WILLIAMS. Objections to R&R due by 6/25/2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTION TO THE DENIAL OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL Overruling #9 Objection By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying 10 Motion for Reconsideration. Ordinarily, a motion for reconsideration is appropriate only if a moving party presents newly discovered evidence, if there has been an intervening change in the law, or if the moving party can demonstrate that the original decision was based on a manifest error of law or was clearly unjust. In re Hannaford Bros. Co. Customer Data Sec. Breach Litig., 660 F. Supp. 2d 94, 97 (D. Me. 2009). Upon review of the motion, I find no basis to reconsider the prior order on Plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel. Any objection to this order shall be filed in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
May 11, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Reconsideration re #8 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel (NO PDF ATTACHED, See ECF No. 9) by ABIJAH WILLIAMS (tcs)
May 10, 2021 Filing 9 OBJECTION to #8 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by ABIJAH WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tcs)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #7 Motion to Appoint Counsel By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (mtm)
April 29, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER to Business Office from Clerk's Office re ABIJAH WILLIAMS. (tcs)
April 28, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by ABIJAH WILLIAMS (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(tcs)
April 28, 2021 Filing 5 INDICATION by Prisoner ABIJAH WILLIAMS of Intent to Proceed; Prison Business office notified. (Attachments: #1 ECF No. 4, #2 Envelope)(tcs)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's intent to proceed due 5/12/2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
April 21, 2021 Set Deadlines: Prisoner Intent to Proceed Deadline 5/12/2021. (MFS)
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by ABIJAH WILLIAMS re #1 Complaint. (Main Document: Continuance of Complaint). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Envelope)(tcs)
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ABIJAH WILLIAMS (Attachments: #1 Resident Account Summary)(aks)
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AARON M FREY, JOHN D PELLETIER, MATTHEW WILLIAMS filed by ABIJAH WILLIAMS. (Service of Process Deadline 7/19/2021) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(aks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS v. FREY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AARON M FREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN D PELLETIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABIJAH WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?