SHERIFF et al v. GARDNER et al
Plaintiff: MIKE JOHANNES and ANDREW SHERIFF
Defendant: MATTHEW GARDNER, KING REAL ESTATE and 440 MOUNT HOPE REALTY TRUST
Case Number: 2:2021cv00115
Filed: April 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by KING REAL ESTATE Responses due by 7/14/2021. (BOUCHARD, HILLARY)
June 16, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by KING REAL ESTATE. (BOUCHARD, HILLARY)
June 9, 2021 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against 440 MOUNT HOPE REALTY TRUST, MATTHEW GARDNER, KING REAL ESTATE, filed by ANDREW SHERIFF, MIKE JOHANNES.(lrt)
June 4, 2021 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 440 MOUNT HOPE REALTY TRUST. (MONTELEONE, JAMES)
June 3, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties by KING REAL ESTATE (BOUCHARD, HILLARY)
June 3, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by HILLARY J. BOUCHARD on behalf of KING REAL ESTATE (BOUCHARD, HILLARY)
June 2, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MIKE JOHANNES, ANDREW SHERIFF. Reply due by 6/16/2021. (lrt)
May 28, 2021 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement from King Real Estate and 440 Mount Hope Realty Trust due by 6/4/2021. (lrt)
May 27, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by 440 MOUNT HOPE REALTY TRUST, MATTHEW GARDNER Responses due by 6/17/2021. (MONTELEONE, JAMES)
May 26, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ANDREW SHERIFF, MIKE JOHANNES. MATTHEW GARDNER served on 5/14/2021.Answer due by 6/4/2021. (lrt)
May 26, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #8 Summons Returned Executed : This docket entry was modified to reflect that the answer deadline set is only as to 440 Mount Hope Realty Trust, not also as to Matthew Gardner. The answer deadline for Matthew Gardner will be reset in accordance with the summons returned executed filed this date. (lrt)
May 25, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by KING REAL ESTATE Responses due by 6/15/2021. (BOWIE, JAMES)
May 25, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES M. BOWIE on behalf of KING REAL ESTATE (BOWIE, JAMES)
May 19, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ANDREW SHERIFF, MIKE JOHANNES. 440 MOUNT HOPE REALTY TRUST served on 5/6/2021.Answers due by 5/27/2021. (lrt) Modified on 5/26/2021 to remove Matthew Gardner from the docket text (lrt).
May 10, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ANDREW SHERIFF, MIKE JOHANNES. KING REAL ESTATE served on 5/4/2021.Answer due by 5/25/2021. (lrt)
April 29, 2021 Filing Fee Received from MIKE JOHANNES, ANDREW SHERIFF: Amount Paid: $402. Receipt Number: 221000880. Method of Payment: credit card. Purpose of Payment: civil filing fee. Date Paid: 4/28/2021 (bfa)
April 28, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerks Office providing Information for Pro Se Parties handout. (bfa)
April 28, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to 440 MOUNT HOPE REALTY TRUST, MATTHEW GARDNER, KING REAL ESTATE. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Matthew Gardner summons, #2 440 Mount Hope Realty Trust)(bfa)
April 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance form filed by ANDREW SHERIFF (bfa)
April 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance form filed by MIKE JOHANNES (bfa)
April 28, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
April 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 440 MOUNT HOPE REALTY TRUST, MATTHEW GARDNER, KING REAL ESTATE PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by ANDREW SHERIFF, MIKE JOHANNES. (Service of Process Deadline 7/27/2021) Fee due by 4/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Signed Purchase and Sale Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Signed and Initialed Non-Refundable Check Deposit for $50,000, #3 Exhibit C - New Sale Price Reduction Email, #4 Exhibit D - Maine Short Fonn Warranty Deed, #5 Exhibit E - Property Disclosure, #6 Exhibit F - 2019 Property Tax Bill, #7 Exhibit G - 2019 Expense Totals, #8 Exhibit H - Residential Lease Unit B, #9 Exhibit I - Residential Lease Unit C, #10 Exhibit J - Residential lease Unit D, #11 Exhibit K - Code Enforcement Notice of Violations, Order to Correct, #12 Exhibit L - Code Enforcement Violations Status Email, #13 Exhibit M - Professional Estimate Restoration/Service/Remodel, #14 Exhibit N - Master Electrician Invoice, #15 Exhibit O - Addendum 1, #16 Exhibit P - Addendum 1 Revised)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHERIFF et al v. GARDNER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIKE JOHANNES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW SHERIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW GARDNER
Represented By: JAMES G. MONTELEONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KING REAL ESTATE
Represented By: JAMES M. BOWIE
Represented By: HILLARY J. BOUCHARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 440 MOUNT HOPE REALTY TRUST
Represented By: JAMES G. MONTELEONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?