BARTH v. TOWN OF WATERBORO et al
Plaintiff: JOHN BARTH
Defendant: GARY LAMB, TOWN OF WATERBORO, JONATHAN BROGAN and SAMUEL JOHNSON
Case Number: 2:2021cv00127
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Filing 27 CLERK'S First SUPPLEMENTAL CERTIFICATE Re: #22 Notice of Appeal. Documents Sent to U.S. Court of Appeals (bfa)
July 8, 2021 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #22 Notice of Appeal (bfa)
July 7, 2021 Filing 26 DOCUMENTS RECEIVED IN PAPER filed by JOHN BARTH re #22 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Appellant Certificate That No Transcript Is To Be Ordered, #2 Envelope)(clp)
July 7, 2021 Filing 25 USCA Case Number 21-1513 for #22 Notice of Appeal, filed by JOHN BARTH. (bfa)
July 7, 2021 Filing 24 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE Re: #22 Notice of Appeal. Documents sent to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (bfa)
July 7, 2021 Filing 23 APPEAL COVER SHEET Re: #22 Notice of Appeal (bfa)
July 7, 2021 USCA Appeal Fees Received from JOHN BARTH: Amount Paid: $505. Receipt Number: 221001137. Method of Payment: check. Date Paid: 7/7/2021 re #22 Notice of Appeal. (bfa)
July 7, 2021 Abbreviated Appeal Record Transmitted Electronically to U.S. Court of Appeals re #22 Notice of Appeal (bfa)
July 7, 2021 COPIES of Notice of Appeal Sent to Counsel Re: #22 Notice of Appeal, filed by JOHN BARTH. (bfa)
July 3, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by JOHN BARTH as to #21 JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from our web site at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms/ MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel should also register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf and review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at # http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf (Attachments: #1 Appellant Certificate that no Transcript is to be Ordered, #2 Transcipt Order Form, #3 Email Containing Filing)(mnd)
June 24, 2021 Filing 21 JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL- By DEPUTY CLERK: Charity Pelletier. (clp)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS granting #4 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #5 Motion for Sanctions; mooting #15 Motion to Strike; mooting #18 Motion to Strike, Motion for Order By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (clp)
June 23, 2021 Filing 19 DOCUMENTS RECEIVED in Paper filed by JOHN BARTH re #18 Motion to Strike, Motion for Order.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(clp)
June 22, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Strike All Defendant Filings, MOTION for Order to Answer or Summary Judgment by JOHN BARTH Responses due by 7/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Email Received to ECF Inbox 6/22/2021)(clp)
June 19, 2021 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE re #13 Addendum Showing Standing, #14 Memorandum of Law Addendum, #16 Response in Opposition to Motion to Strike filed by JOHN BARTH (Attachments: #1 Email Received to ECF Inbox 6/19/2021)(clp)
June 16, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Strike #13 Addendum Showing Standing, #14 Memorandum of Law Addendum filed by JOHN BARTH. Reply due by 6/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Email Received to ECF Inbox 6/16/2021)(clp)
June 15, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Strike #13 Addendum Showing Standing, #14 Memorandum of Law Addendum by JONATHAN BROGAN, SAMUEL JOHNSON, GARY LAMB, TOWN OF WATERBORO Responses due by 7/6/2021. (JOHNSON, SAMUEL) Modified on 6/15/2021 to clean up docket text (clp).
June 11, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OF LAW ADDENDUM re #10 OPPOSITION to Perjured Defendants' Motions for Dismissal and Sanctions filed by JOHN BARTH. (Attachments: #1 Email Received to ECF Inbox 6/11/2021)(clp)
June 10, 2021 Filing 13 ADDENDUM SHOWING STANDING filed by JOHN BARTH (Attachments: #1 Email Received to ECF Inbox 6/10/2021) (clp)
June 9, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY to #10 Opposition to Perjured Defendant's Motions for Dismissal and Sanctions re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by JONATHAN BROGAN, SAMUEL JOHNSON, GARY LAMB, TOWN OF WATERBORO. (JOHNSON, SAMUEL) Modified on 6/9/2021 to clean up text (clp).
June 9, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY to #10 Opposition to Perjured Defendant's Motions for Dismissal and Sanctions re #5 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 filed by JONATHAN BROGAN, SAMUEL JOHNSON, GARY LAMB, TOWN OF WATERBORO. (JOHNSON, SAMUEL) Modified on 6/9/2021 to clean up text (clp).
May 30, 2021 Filing 10 OPPOSITION to Perjured Defendant's Motions for Dismissal and Sanctions re #4 MOTION to Dismiss, #5 MOTION for Sanctions pursuant to Rule 11, filed by JOHN BARTH. Reply due by 6/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Email Received to ECF Inbox 5/30/2021)(clp)
May 27, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHN BARTH. JONATHAN BROGAN served on 5/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Envelope)(mnd)
May 27, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHN BARTH. SAMUEL JOHNSON served on 5/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Envelope)(mnd)
May 27, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHN BARTH. TOWN OF WATERBORO served on 5/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Envelope)(mnd)
May 27, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHN BARTH. GARY LAMB served on 5/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Envelope)(mnd)
May 27, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Sanctions pursuant to Rule 11 by JONATHAN BROGAN, SAMUEL JOHNSON, GARY LAMB, TOWN OF WATERBORO Responses due by 6/17/2021. (JOHNSON, SAMUEL)
May 27, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by JONATHAN BROGAN, SAMUEL JOHNSON, GARY LAMB, TOWN OF WATERBORO Responses due by 6/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Decision and Order on Rule 80B Appeal and Plaintiff's MSJ, #2 Exhibit Decision and Order on Pending Issues, #3 Exhibit Memorandum of Decision)(JOHNSON, SAMUEL)
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM of Law 1 concerning Vested Rights and Municipal Liability by JOHN BARTH. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law 2 concerning Municipal Liability for Civil Rights Violations and Constructive Taking of Property, #2 Memorandum of Law 3 concerning Libel, Fraud, and Conspiracy of Defendant Lamb, and Damages, #3 Memorandum of Law 4 concerning Major Errors of the State Court Decision, #4 Plaintiff Exhibits, #5 Email Received to ECF Inbox 5/14/2021)(clp)
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to JONATHAN BROGAN, SAMUEL JOHNSON, GARY LAMB, TOWN OF WATERBORO. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: # Main Document-Summons Town of Waterboro (1) Summons Gary Lamb, #2 Summons Samuel Johnson, #3 Summons Jonathan Brogan)(clp)
May 13, 2021 Filing Fee Received from JOHN BARTH: Amount Paid: $402.00. Receipt Number: 221000950. Method of Payment: Credit Card. Purpose of Payment: Civil Case Opening Filing Fee. Date Paid: 5/13/2021. (mnd)
May 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JONATHAN BROGAN, SAMUEL JOHNSON, GARY LAMB, TOWN OF WATERBORO PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by JOHN BARTH. (Service of Process Deadline 8/10/2021) Fee due by 5/14/2021.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BARTH v. TOWN OF WATERBORO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY LAMB
Represented By: JONATHAN W. BROGAN
Represented By: SAMUEL G. JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF WATERBORO
Represented By: JONATHAN W. BROGAN
Represented By: SAMUEL G. JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONATHAN BROGAN
Represented By: JONATHAN W. BROGAN
Represented By: SAMUEL G. JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMUEL JOHNSON
Represented By: JONATHAN W. BROGAN
Represented By: SAMUEL G. JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN BARTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?