RIVARD v. SINENI et al
Plaintiff: JEFFREY M RIVARD
Defendant: BIDDEFORD YORK COURTS, JUDGE ANDRE JANELLE, BIDDEFORD PROSECUTION, STATE OF MAINE and ANTHONY J SINENI, III
Case Number: 2:2021cv00130
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Objection to Report and Recommended Decision re #7 Report and Recommended Decision filed by JEFFREY M RIVARD. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lrt)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND RECOMMENDED DISMISSAL OF THE CASE re #1 Complaint #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #5 MOTION Hearing for discovery dispute. Objections to R&R due by 7/9/2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (slg)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #3 Notice of Pro Se Appearance : document #3 had an incorrect page 2 attached. Document #4 was missing page 2. (bfa)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION Hearing for discovery dispute by JEFFREY M RIVARD Responses due by 6/3/2021. (bfa)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JEFFREY M RIVARD (bfa) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/21/2021) (bfa).
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance form filed by JEFFREY M RIVARD (bfa) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/21/2021) (bfa).
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BIDDEFORD PROSECUTION, BIDDEFORD YORK COURTS, ANDRE JANELLE, ANTHONY J SINENI, III, STATE OF MAINE, filed by JEFFREY M RIVARD. (Service of Process Deadline 8/11/2021) (Attachments: #1 certificate of service, #2 envelope)(bfa) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/23/2021) (lrt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RIVARD v. SINENI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIDDEFORD YORK COURTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDGE ANDRE JANELLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIDDEFORD PROSECUTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF MAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY J SINENI, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY M RIVARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?