UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $3,616,083.15IN US CURRENCY
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $3,616,083.15IN US CURRENCY and $3,616,083.15 IN US CURRENCY
Case Number: 2:2021cv00136
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 924
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2021 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to $3,616,083.15IN US CURRENCY served on 6/4/2021. (CLARK, DONALD)
June 9, 2021 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Med-Tech Resource, LLC served on 5/21/2021. (CLARK, DONALD)
May 17, 2021 Filing 3 WARRANT In Rem Issued By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
May 14, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $3,616,083.15IN US CURRENCY, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Service of Process Deadline 8/12/2021)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $3,616,083.15IN US CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $3,616,083.15IN US CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $3,616,083.15 IN US CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: DONALD E. CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?