DREAM CAPITAL MANAGEMENT LLC v. DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY
Plaintiff: DREAM CAPITAL MANAGMENT LLC and DREAM CAPITAL MANAGEMENT
Defendant: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY
Interested Party: DENNIS HENNESSEY, MIDLAND FUNDING LLC, ONEWEST BANK FSB, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE and SHEILA HENNESSEY
Case Number: 2:2021cv00173
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/24/2021. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 12/1/2021. Motions due by 12/15/2021. Ready for Trial on 2/2/2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
July 7, 2021 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record)(MESSINGER, BRETT)
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY.(MESSINGER, BRETT)
July 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH M. LACOMBE on behalf of DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY (LACOMBE, ELIZABETH)
June 29, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY. (MESSINGER, BRETT)
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 7/6/2021. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number RE-21-13. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY. (Service of Process Deadline 9/27/2021) Fee due by 6/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 summons and complaint)(bfa)
June 28, 2021 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2513568.), filed by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY.(MESSINGER, BRETT)
June 28, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY : Answer due by 7/6/2021. (bfa)
June 28, 2021 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/6/2021. (bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DREAM CAPITAL MANAGEMENT LLC v. DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DREAM CAPITAL MANAGMENT LLC
Represented By: JOHN A. DOONAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DREAM CAPITAL MANAGEMENT
Represented By: JOHN A. DOONAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DENNIS HENNESSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ONEWEST BANK FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Represented By: ASHLEY E. EILER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SHEILA HENNESSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY
Represented By: BRETT L. MESSINGER
Represented By: ELIZABETH M. LACOMBE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?