RUTKA v. TAMAKI
Plaintiff: JENNIFER RUTKA
Defendant: ATSUSHI TAMAKI
Case Number: 2:2021cv00180
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Seal By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
August 23, 2021 Filing 10 Redacted MOTION for Clifford Order by JENNIFER RUTKA Responses due by 9/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Redacted Order on Motion to Produce)(LEVINE, ROBERT)
August 23, 2021 Filing 9 (Document sealed from public view) MOTION to Seal Unredacted Pleading No. 7 by JENNIFER RUTKA Responses due by 9/13/2021. (LEVINE, ROBERT)
August 23, 2021 Set Deadlines: Per counsel, a Motion to Seal and Redacted Motion and Proposed Order to be filed. Check for filing by 8/24/2021. (mlm)
August 19, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE re #7 MOTION For Clifford Order filed by JENNIFER RUTKA. Although the Clerks Office has no obligation to review pleadings for personal identifiers, please note that the above-referenced document contains personal identifiers in violation of Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 49.1. The filing party may remedy this violation by filing a redacted version of the document and separately filing a Motion to Seal the previously filed unredacted document. If no action is taken the unredacted document will remain publicly available. (mlm)
August 18, 2021 Filing 7 (Document sealed from public view) MOTION For Clifford Order by JENNIFER RUTKA Responses due by 9/8/2021. (LEVINE, ROBERT) Modified on 8/19/2021 to seal documents pending motion to seal (mlm).
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/16/2021. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 12/23/2021. Motions due by 1/6/2022. Ready for Trial on 3/1/2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
July 28, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by ATSUSHI TAMAKI.(MCKEE, WALTER)
July 21, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JENNIFER RUTKA. ATSUSHI TAMAKI served on 7/13/2021. (LEVINE, ROBERT)
July 21, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for ATSUSHI TAMAKI : Answer due by 8/3/2021. (mmm)
June 30, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ATSUSHI TAMAKI. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
June 30, 2021 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2514664.), filed by JENNIFER RUTKA.(LEVINE, ROBERT)
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ATSUSHI TAMAKI PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by JENNIFER RUTKA. (Service of Process Deadline 9/27/2021) Fee due by 6/30/2021.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RUTKA v. TAMAKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER RUTKA
Represented By: ROBERT A. LEVINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATSUSHI TAMAKI
Represented By: WALTER F. MCKEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?