WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB AS TRUSTEE FOR PRETIUM MORTGAGE ACQUISITION TRUST v. CAMPO
Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB AS TRUSTEE FOR PRETIUM MORTGAGE ACQUISITION TRUST doing business as CHRISTIANA TRUST
Defendant: BENJAMIN P CAMPO, JR
Interested Party: DISCOVER BANK, GREAT SENECA FINANCIAL CORP and DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00190
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines : No answer or responsive pleading filed by DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC. Check for the Filing of a Motion for Entry of Default on 9/10/2021. (mnd)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Defendant Special Administrator ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by BENJAMIN P CAMPO, JR.(CAMPO, BENJAMIN)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB AS TRUSTEE FOR PRETIUM MORTGAGE ACQUISITION TRUST. DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC served on 7/20/2021. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AGREEMENT of Acceptance of Service by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB AS TRUSTEE FOR PRETIUM MORTGAGE ACQUISITION TRUST (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Answer Deadline for DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC per ECF No. 5 - Summons Returned Executed on 7/20/2021. Answer due by 8/10/2021. (slg) Modified on 7/30/2021 to correct ECF No of Summons (slg).
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BENJAMIN P CAMPO, JR, DISCOVER BANK, DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC, GREAT SENECA FINANCIAL CORP. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons-Discover Bank, #2 Summons-Discover Financial, #3 Summons-Great Seneca)(mlm)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2518562.), filed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB AS TRUSTEE FOR PRETIUM MORTGAGE ACQUISITION TRUST.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (mlm)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BENJAMIN P CAMPO, JR, DISCOVER BANK, DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC, GREAT SENECA FINANCIAL CORP PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB AS TRUSTEE FOR PRETIUM MORTGAGE ACQUISITION TRUST. (Service of Process Deadline 10/6/2021) Fee due by 7/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exh A Legal Description, #2 Exh B Note, #3 Exh C Mortgage, #4 Exh D Loan Modification Agreement, #5 Exh E Assignment of Mortgage Federal National, #6 Exh F Assignment of Mortgage Wilmington, #7 Exh G Demand Letter, #8 Exh H Affidavit re: Military Search)(mlm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB AS TRUSTEE FOR PRETIUM MORTGAGE ACQUISITION TRUST v. CAMPO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB AS TRUSTEE FOR PRETIUM MORTGAGE ACQUISITION TRUST doing business as CHRISTIANA TRUST
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENJAMIN P CAMPO, JR
Represented By: BENJAMIN P. CAMPO, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DISCOVER BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: GREAT SENECA FINANCIAL CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?