US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. SALAMONE
Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST
Defendant: LAURIE SALAMONE
Interested Party: TD BANK NA, BANKNORTH NA, PHIL GAGNON OIL COMPANY, CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA, MIDLAND FUNDING LLC and FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2021cv00203
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA served on 8/3/2021. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
September 15, 2021 Reset Deadlines Regarding Affidavit of Service : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 10/15/2021 as to LAURIE SALAMONE, FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORPORATION and MIDLAND FUNDING LLC and CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA. (jwr)
August 18, 2021 Set Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to LAURIE SALAMONE, FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORPORATION and MIDLAND FUNDING LLC on 9/17/2021. (mmm)
August 6, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. MIDLAND FUNDING LLC served on 7/27/2021. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
August 6, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORPORATION served on 7/27/2021. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
August 6, 2021 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Summons Returned Executed for FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORPORATION and MIDLAND FUNDING LLC : Answer due by 8/17/2021. (mmm)
July 30, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. LAURIE SALAMONE served on 7/24/2021. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
July 30, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for LAURIE SALAMONE : Answer due by 8/16/2021. (mmm)
July 21, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA, FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORPORATION, MIDLAND FUNDING LLC, PHIL GAGNON OIL COMPANY, LAURIE SALAMONE, TD BANK NA. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Capital One Bank (USA) NA summons, #2 First Resolution Investment Corporation summons, #3 Midland Funding LLC summons, #4 Phil Gagnon Oil Company summons, #5 TD Bank NA summons)(bfa)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LAURIE SALAMONE PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. (Service of Process Deadline 10/18/2021) Fee due by 7/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B Note, #3 Exhibit C Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D Assignment into GMAC Mortgage LLC, #5 Exhibit E Assignment into Ocwen, #6 Exhibit F Quitclaim Assignment into Ocwen, #7 Exhibit G Assignment into Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, #8 Exhibit H Assignment into US Bank Trust NA, #9 Exhibit I Loan Modification Agreement, #10 Exhibit J Loan Modification Agreement, #11 Exhibit K Demand Letter, #12 Exhibit L Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(bfa)
July 20, 2021 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/27/2021. (bfa)
July 20, 2021 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2523639.), filed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. SALAMONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: TD BANK NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: BANKNORTH NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PHIL GAGNON OIL COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURIE SALAMONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?