US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION v. RICHMOND et al
Plaintiff: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Defendant: ERIC RICHMOND, CITIMORTGAGE INC, ERIC H RICHMOND and CITICORP MORTGAGE INC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00208
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Entry of Default (no answer or responsive pleading having been filed) as to CITIMORTGAGE INC By DEPUTY CLERK: Teagan Snyder(tcs)
September 24, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default as to CitiMortgage, Inc., f/k/a Citicorp Mortgage, Inc. by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION Responses due by 10/15/2021. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
September 23, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. ERIC RICHMOND served on 9/13/2021. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
September 23, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for ERIC RICHMOND : Answer due by 10/4/2021. (tcs)
August 27, 2021 Set Deadlines: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to CITIMORTGAGE INC on 9/27/2021. (tcs)
August 25, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. CITIMORTGAGE INC served on 8/5/2021. (DOONAN, JOHN)
August 25, 2021 Set Answer Deadline for CITIMORTGAGE INC: Answer due by 8/26/2021. (tcs)
August 3, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CITIMORTGAGE INC, ERIC RICHMOND. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Eric Richmond summons)(bfa)
July 30, 2021 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/6/2021. (bfa)
July 30, 2021 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2528727.), filed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITIMORTGAGE INC, ERIC RICHMOND PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Service of Process Deadline 10/27/2021) Fee due by 8/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B Note, #3 Exhibit C Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D Assignment into US Bank National Association, #5 Exhibit E Demand Letters, #6 Exhibit F Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION v. RICHMOND et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC RICHMOND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITIMORTGAGE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC H RICHMOND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITICORP MORTGAGE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?