GRAHAM v. COSTELLO et al
Plaintiff: MARK GRAHAM
Defendant: CAPTAIN DAVID COSTELLO, LT JORDAN, SGT FLECHER, SGT PHILLIPS, WARDEN-MAJOR, DOCTOR EDDY, ARMOR HEALTHCARE, JUAN, CUMBERLAND COUNTY JAIL OFFICIALS and ELENA USOVA
Case Number: 2:2021cv00258
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 11/17/2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ACCEPTING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND COK WARNING re: #5 Report and Recommendations; denying #3 Motion for TRO ; denying 10 Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing. By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (aks)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Objection #8 to Report and Recommended Decision re #5 Report and Recommended Decision. filed by MARK GRAHAM. Response to Objection to Report and Recommendations due by 10/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(aks)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Objection #7 to Report and Recommended Decision re #5 Report and Recommended Decision. filed by MARK GRAHAM. Response to Objection to Report and Recommendations due by 10/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(aks)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Objection #6 to Report and Recommended Decision re #5 Report and Recommended Decision. filed by MARK GRAHAM. Response to Objection to Report and Recommendations due by 10/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Envelope)(aks)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Reconsideration. Ordinarily, a motion for reconsideration is appropriate only if a moving party presents newly discovered evidence, if there has been an intervening change in the law, or if the moving party can demonstrate that the original decision was based on a manifest error of law or was clearly unjust. In re Hannaford Bros. Co. Customer Data Sec. Breach Litig., 660 F. Supp. 2d 94, 97 (D. Me. 2009). Plaintiff has presented no persuasive evidence or argument that would support a reconsideration of the Court's order directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk is directed to send Plaintiff the form Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The deadline for Plaintiff to pay the filing fee or file a request to proceed in forma pauperis is extended to October 22, 2021. Any objection to this order shall be filed in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines: Filing fee or Informa Pauperis Application due by 10/22/2021. (MFS)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Objection #5 to Report and Recommended Decision re #5 Report and Recommended Decision.. Response to Objection to Report and Recommendations due by 10/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(aks)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Objection #4 to Report and Recommended Decision re #5 Report and Recommended Decision. filed by MARK GRAHAM. Response to Objection to Report and Recommendations due by 10/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(aks)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Objection #3 to Report and Recommended Decision re #5 Report and Recommended Decision filed by MARK GRAHAM. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jgd)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Hearing by MARK GRAHAM (No PDF attached; see pleading #9) (mlm)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Objection #2 to Report and Recommended Decision re #5 Report and Recommended Decision. filed by MARK GRAHAM. Response to Objection to Report and Recommendations due by 10/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mlm)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MARK GRAHAM re #7 Objection to Report and Recommended Decision, #6 MOTION for Reconsideration (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(aks)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Objection to Report and Recommended Decision re #5 Report and Recommended Decision. filed by MARK GRAHAM. Response to Objection to Report and Recommendations due by 10/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 R&R, #2 Envelope)(aks)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Reconsideration by MARK GRAHAM (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(aks)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by MARK GRAHAM. Objections to R&R due by 9/29/2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines: Filing Fee or new IFP due by 9/27/2021. (MFS)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by MARK GRAHAM (bfa)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MARK GRAHAM (bfa)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ARMOR HEALTHCARE, DAVID COSTELLO, CUMBERLAND COUNTY JAIL OFFICIALS, EDDY, FLECHER, JORDAN, JUAN, PHILLIPS, ELENA USOVA, WARDEN-MAJOR, filed by MARK GRAHAM. (Service of Process Deadline 12/8/2021) (Attachments: #1 envelope)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRAHAM v. COSTELLO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPTAIN DAVID COSTELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT JORDAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT FLECHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT PHILLIPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARDEN-MAJOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOCTOR EDDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMOR HEALTHCARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUMBERLAND COUNTY JAIL OFFICIALS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELENA USOVA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?