MORSE v. DOUGLAS et al
Plaintiff: SONNY JAMES MORSE
Defendant: WAYNE DOUGLAS, KATRYN LOFTUS SLATTERY, SHIRA BURNS and YORK COUNTY
Case Number: 2:2021cv00282
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Objection to Report and Recommended Decision re #5 Report and Recommended Decision filed by SONNY JAMES MORSE. Response to Objection to Report and Recommendations due by 11/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mmy)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re #1 Complaint filed by SONNY JAMES MORSE. Objections to R&R due by 10/27/2021. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by SONNY JAMES MORSE (Attachments: #1 trust account statement)(bfa)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance form filed by SONNY JAMES MORSE (bfa)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SHIRA BURNS, WAYNE DOUGLAS, KATRYN LOFTUS SLATTERY, YORK COUNTY with Jury Demand, filed by SONNY JAMES MORSE. (Service of Process Deadline 1/4/2022) (Attachments: #1 envelope)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MORSE v. DOUGLAS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONNY JAMES MORSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAYNE DOUGLAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATRYN LOFTUS SLATTERY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHIRA BURNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YORK COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?