MURCH v. ACAPELLO SALONS INC
Plaintiff: BRITNI MURCH
Defendant: ACAPELLO SALONS INC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00330
Filed: November 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Video Settlement Conference for 2/28/2022 at 8:30 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. In Camera Settlement Papers due by 2/22/2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
December 7, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ACAPELLO SALONS INC. (BROGAN, JONATHAN)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/21/2022. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 4/28/2022. Motions due by 5/12/2022. Ready for Trial on 6/6/2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
December 2, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by ACAPELLO SALONS INC.(BROGAN, JONATHAN)
December 2, 2021 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1, defendant's Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/8/2021. (lrt)
November 24, 2021 Filing Fee Received from BRITNI MURCH: Amount Paid: $402. Receipt Number: AMEDC-2582855. Purpose of Payment: Case Opening Filing Fee. Date Paid: 11/24/2021 (mlm)
November 23, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ACAPELLO SALONS INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (clp)
November 22, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (clp)
November 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ACAPELLO SALONS INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by BRITNI MURCH. (Service of Process Deadline 2/22/2022) Fee due by 11/24/2021.(clp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MURCH v. ACAPELLO SALONS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRITNI MURCH
Represented By: DANIELLE M. QUINLAN
Represented By: LAURA H. WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACAPELLO SALONS INC
Represented By: JONATHAN W. BROGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?