TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2018-1, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE v. BISBEE et al
Plaintiff: TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2018-1, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE
Defendant: BRADLEY BISBEE and CANDY BISBEE
Interested Party: RAB PERFORMANCE RECOVERIES LLC, DIRIGO FEDERAL CREDIT UNION and SEBASTICOOK VALLEY HOSPITAL
Not Classified By Court: RAINBOW CREDIT UNION
Case Number: 2:2022cv00037
Filed: February 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Entry of Default (no answer or responsive pleading having been filed) as to BRADLEY BISBEE, DIRIGO FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, RAB PERFORMANCE RECOVERIES LLC, SEBASTICOOK VALLEY HOSPITAL. By DEPUTY CLERK: M. Maker (mmy)
April 7, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Entry of Default as to BRADLEY BISBEE, RAB PERFORMANCE RECOVERIES LLC, DIRIGO FEDERAL CREDIT UNION F/K/A RAINBOW FEDERAL CREDIT UNION AND SEBASTICOOK VALLEY HOSPITAL by TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2018-1, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE Responses due by 4/28/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
March 11, 2022 Reset Deadlines: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to BRADLEY BISBEE, SEBASTICOOK VALLEY HOSPITAL, DIRIGO FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, and RAB PERFORMANCE RECOVERIES LLC on 4/11/2022. (mmy)
March 10, 2022 Set Deadlines: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to BRADLEY BISBEE, SEBASTICOOK VALLEY HOSPITAL, and DIRIGO FEDERAL CREDIT UNION on 4/11/2022. (mmy)
March 3, 2022 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service by TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2018-1, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE. RAB PERFORMANCE RECOVERIES LLC served on 2/17/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
March 3, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2018-1, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE. DIRIGO FEDERAL CREDIT UNION served on 2/15/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) Modified on 3/3/2022 to correct service date (mmy).
March 3, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2018-1, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE. BRADLEY BISBEE served on 2/15/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
March 3, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2018-1, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE. SEBASTICOOK VALLEY HOSPITAL served on 2/15/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
March 3, 2022 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Summonses Returned Executed for BRADLEY BISBEE, SEBASTICOOK VALLEY HOSPITAL, and DIRIGO FEDERAL CREDIT UNION: Answers due by 3/8/2022. (mmy)
March 3, 2022 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Affidavit of Service for RAB PERFORMANCE RECOVERIES LLC: Answer due by 3/10/2022. (mmy)
February 11, 2022 Filing Fee Received from TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2018-1, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE: Amount Paid: $402.00. Receipt Number: AMEDC-2613918. Method of Payment: Credit Card via Pay.Gov. Purpose of Payment: Filing Fee. Date Paid: 2/8/2022. (jgd)
February 10, 2022 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2018-1, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
February 9, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to DIRIGO FEDERAL CREDIT UNION. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (mmy)
February 9, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BRADLEY BISBEE, CANDY BISBEE, DIRIGO FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, RAB PERFORMANCE RECOVERIES LLC, SEBASTICOOK VALLEY HOSPITAL, filed by TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2018-1, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE. (Service of Process Deadline 5/10/2022)(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Amend. Plaintiff shall file the amended complaint on or before February 15, 2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
February 8, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint,,,, by TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2018-1, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE Responses due by 3/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
February 8, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BRADLEY BISBEE, CANDY BISBEE, RAB PERFORMANCE RECOVERIES LLC, SEBASTICOOK VALLEY HOSPITAL. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Bradley Bisbee summons, #2 Sebasticook Valley Hospital, #3 RAB Performance Recoveries LLC)(bfa)
February 8, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
February 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRADLEY BISBEE, CANDY BISBEE PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2018-1, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE. (Service of Process Deadline 5/9/2022) Fee due by 2/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B Disclosure Statement, Note and Security Instrument, #3 Exhibit C Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D -Assignment into CitiFinancial Servicing, LLC, #5 Exhibit E - Assignment into Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, #6 Exhibit F - Assignment into MF Dispositions, #7 Exhibit G - Assignment into Towd Point Master Funding, #8 Exhibit H - Assignment into FirstKey Mortgage, #9 Exhibit I - Assignment into Towd Point Mortgage Trust, #10 Exhibit J - Demand, #11 Exhibit K Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(bfa)
February 8, 2022 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/15/2022. (bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2018-1, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE v. BISBEE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2018-1, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRADLEY BISBEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANDY BISBEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: RAB PERFORMANCE RECOVERIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DIRIGO FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SEBASTICOOK VALLEY HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: RAINBOW CREDIT UNION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?