WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB v. RICHARDS et al
Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust
Defendant: ANGELA M RICHARDS, ANGELA M HARKINS and CHAD J RICHARDS
Case Number: 2:2022cv00105
Filed: April 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/19/2022. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 10/26/2022. Motions due by 11/9/2022. Ready for Trial on 1/3/2023. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Entry of Default (no answer or responsive pleading having been filed) as to CHAD J RICHARDS By DEPUTY CLERK: M. Maker (mmy)
June 1, 2022 Set Deadlines: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default Judgment as to CHAD J RICHARDS on 11/9/2022. (mmy)
May 31, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant, Chad J. Richards by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB Responses due by 6/21/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
May 23, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ANGELA M RICHARDS. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(mmy)
May 19, 2022 Set Deadlines: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to ANGELA M RICHARDS and CHAD J RICHARDS on 6/21/2022. (mmy)
May 3, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #5 SUMMONS returned executed, #6 SUMMONS returned executed: These entries have been corrected to reflect the proper filing event is summons returned executed and not affidavit of service as originally filed. (mmy)
May 3, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB. ANGELA M RICHARDS served on 4/26/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) Modified on 5/3/2022 to correct document description (mmy).
May 3, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB. CHAD J RICHARDS served on 4/25/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) Modified on 5/3/2022 to document description (mmy).
May 3, 2022 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Summons Returned Executed for CHAD J RICHARDS: Answer due by 5/16/2022. (mmy)
May 3, 2022 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Summons Returned Executed for ANGELA M RICHARDS: Answer due by 5/17/2022. (mmy)
April 21, 2022 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
April 19, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ANGELA M RICHARDS, CHAD J RICHARDS. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons for Chad Richards)(jwr)
April 19, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jwr)
April 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB against ANGELA M RICHARDS, CHAD J RICHARDS PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS.. (Service of Process Deadline 7/18/2022) Fee due by 4/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B- Disclosure statement, note and Security Agreement, #3 Exhibit C -Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D - Assignment into Citifinancial Servicing, #5 Exhibit E -Assignment into Bayview Loan, #6 Exhibit F - Assignment into Koltere Dispositions, #7 Exhibit G- Assignment into Wilmington Savings, #8 Exhibit H - Assignment into Wilmington Savings Fund Society, #9 Exhibit I- Demand, #10 Exhibit J - Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(jwr)
April 19, 2022 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2642752.), filed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB v. RICHARDS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGELA M RICHARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGELA M HARKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD J RICHARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?