FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. HOPKINS
Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Defendant: MARY ELLEN A HOPKINS
Interested Party: KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 2:2022cv00154
Filed: May 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING MATTER FOR MEDIATION IN THE MAINE FORECLOSURE DIVERSION PROGRAM By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. Status Report due by 8/22/2022.(tcs)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to File Answer. Defendant's response to the complaint is accepted for filing. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
July 5, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by MARY ELLEN A HOPKINS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tcs)
July 5, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Answer by MARY ELLEN A HOPKINS (tcs)
June 24, 2022 Reset Deadlines: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to MARY ELLEN A HOPKINS and KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION on 7/22/2022. (tcs)
June 22, 2022 Set Deadlines: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION on 7/21/2022. (tcs)
June 6, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. MARY ELLEN A HOPKINS served on 6/1/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
June 6, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION served on 5/31/2022. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
June 6, 2022 Set Answer Deadline for MARY ELLEN A HOPKINS: Answer due by 6/22/2022. (tcs)
June 6, 2022 Set Answer Deadline for KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION: Answer due by 6/21/2022. (tcs)
May 25, 2022 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
May 24, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MARY ELLEN A HOPKINS, KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 KeyBank National Association summons)(bfa)
May 24, 2022 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/31/2022. (bfa)
May 24, 2022 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2656058.), filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
May 23, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
May 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MARY ELLEN A HOPKINS PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (Service of Process Deadline 8/22/2022) Fee due by 5/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B Disclosure Statement, note and Security Agreement, #3 Exhibit C Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D1 Corrective Mortgage, #5 Exhibit D2 Corrective Mortgage , #6Exhibit E Assignment into Federal National Mortgage Association, #7 Exhibit F Assignment into Prof-2013-S3 Legal Title Trust, II, #8 Exhibit G Quitclaim Assignment into Prof-2013-S3 Legal Title Trust II, #9 Exhibit H Assignment into Federal National Mortgage Association, #10 Exhibit I Demand, #11 Exhibit J Affidavit Regarding Military search)(bfa) Modified on 5/24/2022 to correct attachment descriptions(bfa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. HOPKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: LAUREN THOMAS
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY ELLEN A HOPKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?