UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. NEWMAN et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: ROBERT K NEWMAN, KENNEBUNK SAVINGS BANK, THE WOODS ASSOCIATION INC, SUPERIOR PLUS ENERGY SERVICES INC doing business as DOWNEAST ENERGY, CASCO BAY ELECTRIC LLC, MAINE REVENUE SERVICES, MAINE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, BUREAU OF UNEMPLOYMENT COMPENSATION, TAX COLLECTOR OF KENNEBUNK MAINE, WOODS ASSOCIATION INC and MAINE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR BUREAU OF UNEMPLOYMENT COMPENSATION
Case Number: 2:2022cv00373
Filed: November 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2023 Filing 17 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to TAX COLLECTOR OF KENNEBUNK MAINE served on 1/25/2023. (GALISEWSKI, RYAN)
January 25, 2023 Set Answer Deadline for TAX COLLECTOR OF KENNEBUNK MAINE: Answer due by 2/15/2023. (tcs)
January 24, 2023 Set Answer Deadline for ROBERT K NEWMAN: Answer due by 3/13/2023. (tcs)
January 23, 2023 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ROBERT K NEWMAN waiver sent on 1/11/2023. (GALISEWSKI, RYAN)
January 23, 2023 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed WOODS ASSOCIATION INC waiver sent on 12/15/2022. (GALISEWSKI, RYAN)
January 23, 2023 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to SUPERIOR PLUS ENERGY SERVICES INC, WOODS ASSOCIATION INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to The Woods Association, Inc.)(tcs)
January 23, 2023 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Waiver of Service Executed for WOODS ASSOCIATION INC : Answer due by 2/13/2023. (jwr)
January 18, 2023 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed CASCO BAY ELECTRIC LLC waiver sent on 12/15/2022. (GALISEWSKI, RYAN)
January 18, 2023 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed MAINE REVENUE SERVICES waiver sent on 12/20/2022. (GALISEWSKI, RYAN)
January 18, 2023 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed MAINE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR BUREAU OF UNEMPLOYMENT COMPENSATION waiver sent on 12/27/2022. (GALISEWSKI, RYAN)
January 18, 2023 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed KENNEBUNK SAVINGS BANK waiver sent on 12/15/2022. (GALISEWSKI, RYAN)
January 12, 2023 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by KENNEBUNK SAVINGS BANK. (BROOKS, CHRISTOPHER)
January 6, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by MAINE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR BUREAU OF UNEMPLOYMENT COMPENSATION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kerry Hekl)(MACIROWSKI, NANCY)
January 6, 2023 Set Deadlines as to CASCO BAY ELECTRIC LLC: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/13/2023. (tcs)
January 5, 2023 Filing 7 Casco Bay Electric, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by CASCO BAY ELECTRIC LLC.(SHAFTO, JEFFREY)
January 5, 2023 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by KENNEBUNK SAVINGS BANK.(BROOKS, CHRISTOPHER)
January 5, 2023 Set Deadlines as to KENNEBUNK SAVINGS BANK: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/12/2023. (tcs)
January 3, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by MAINE REVENUE SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Tax Lien Amount and Priority Position)(HUSAR, KAITLYN)
December 27, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by NANCY M. MACIROWSKI on behalf of MAINE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR BUREAU OF UNEMPLOYMENT COMPENSATION (MACIROWSKI, NANCY)
December 14, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MAINE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR BUREAU OF UNEMPLOYMENT COMPENSATION, MAINE REVENUE SERVICES, ROBERT K NEWMAN, TAX COLLECTOR OF KENNEBUNK MAINE. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Tax Collector of Kennebunk, Maine, #2 Summons Issued as to Maine Revenue Services, #3 Summons Issued as to Maine Department of Labor, Bureau of Unemployment and Compensation)(tcs)
November 28, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (tcs)
November 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF UNEMPLOYMENT COMPENSATION, CASCO BAY ELECTRIC LLC, KENNEBUNK SAVINGS BANK, MAINE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, MAINE REVENUE SERVICES, ROBERT K NEWMAN, SUPERIOR PLUS ENERGY SERVICES INC, TAX COLLECTOR OF KENNEBUNK MAINE, THE WOODS ASSOCIATION INC, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Service of Process Deadline 2/27/2023) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Warranty Deed)(tcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. NEWMAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: RYAN D. GALISEWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT K NEWMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNEBUNK SAVINGS BANK
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. BROOKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE WOODS ASSOCIATION INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUPERIOR PLUS ENERGY SERVICES INC doing business as DOWNEAST ENERGY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CASCO BAY ELECTRIC LLC
Represented By: JEFFREY SHAFTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINE REVENUE SERVICES
Represented By: KAITLYN M. HUSAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUREAU OF UNEMPLOYMENT COMPENSATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAX COLLECTOR OF KENNEBUNK MAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOODS ASSOCIATION INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR BUREAU OF UNEMPLOYMENT COMPENSATION
Represented By: NANCY M. MACIROWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?