COSTA v. USABLE LIFE
Plaintiff: FERNANDA COSTA
Defendant: USABLE LIFE
Case Number: 2:2022cv00382
Filed: December 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Referring Judge: KAREN FRINK WOLF
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2022 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2739686.), filed by FERNANDA COSTA.(CONNELLY, MEGHAN)
December 12, 2022 Reset Deadlines: Filing Fee due by 12/16/2022. (slg)
December 6, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to USABLE LIFE. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (slg)
December 6, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (slg)
December 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by FERNANDA COSTA against USABLE LIFE PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS.filed by FERNANDA COSTA. (Service of Process Deadline 3/6/2023) Fee due by 12/8/2022.(slg)
December 6, 2022 Set Deadlines/Hearings : Maine has transitioned to the NextGen ECF filing system; therefore, to complete the admissions process, Attorney Meghan E. Connelly must register for a PACER account and/or request the appropriate e-filing rights in the District of Maine via PACER at www.pacer.uscourts.gov by 12/13/2022. NOTE: Counsel appearing Pro Hac Vice MUST click on the PRO HAC VICE link when requesting e-filing rights via PACER. For more details on NextGen/PACER go to our website at www.med.uscourts.gov. (slg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COSTA v. USABLE LIFE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FERNANDA COSTA
Represented By: MEGHAN E. CONNELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USABLE LIFE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?